PAL v. SUPERINTENDENT, STATE CORRECTIONAL INSTITUTION AT GREENE et al
Petitioner: Neil Pal
Respondent: District Attorney Of Lackawanna County, Pennsylvania, Superintendent, State Correctional Institution At Greene and Attorney General (of) Pennsylvania
Case Number: 1:2019cv01589
Filed: September 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Office: Harrisburg Office
Presiding Judge: Martin C Carlson
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 13, 2019 Filing 6 Case electronically transferred in from the Western District of Pennsylvania ; Case Number 2:19-cv-01091.
September 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER adopting Report and Recommendations re #2 Report and Recommendations. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus be TRANSFERRED forthwith to the United States District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of Court mark this case CLOSED. Signed by Judge J. Nicholas Ranjan on 9/13/2019. (av) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Western on 9/13/2019.]
September 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER re #3 Objections filed by NEIL PAL. Response to #3 Objections, if any, shall be filed by 09/13/2019. Response is not to exceed 5 pages in length. Signed by Judge J. Nicholas Ranjan on 09/06/2019. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (dny) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Western on 9/13/2019.]
September 6, 2019 Filing 3 OBJECTIONS to Report and Recommendation by NEIL PAL. (Foster, David) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Western on 9/13/2019.]
August 29, 2019 Filing 2 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by NEIL PAL. It is respectfully recommended that the Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus be transferred to the United States District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania as more fully set forth in the attached R&R. Objections to R&R due by 9/12/2019. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Cynthia Reed Eddy on 8/29/2019. (sms) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Western on 9/13/2019.]
August 28, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus (Filing fee $5, receipt number 0315-5264138), filed by NEIL PAL. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D) (mao) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Western on 9/13/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: PAL v. SUPERINTENDENT, STATE CORRECTIONAL INSTITUTION AT GREENE et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: District Attorney Of Lackawanna County, Pennsylvania
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Superintendent, State Correctional Institution At Greene
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Attorney General (of) Pennsylvania
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Neil Pal
Represented By: David J. Foster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?