U.S. Transport Corporation v. Jay Enterprises, Inc.
Plaintiff: U.S. Transport Corporation
Defendant: Jay Enterprises, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv01607
Filed: September 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: John E Jones
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 14, 2019 Filing 13 SPECIAL ADMISSIONS FORM APPROVED as to John R. Solter, Jr (eo)
November 12, 2019 DOCKET ANNOTATION: Petitioning attorney and associate counsel's bar status verified. (aaa)
November 12, 2019 Filing 12 PETITION FOR SPECIAL ADMISSION (PRO HAC VICE) by Alan L. Frank on behalf of Jay Enterprises, Inc. Attorney John Solter, Jr. is seeking special admission. Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0314-4924872.. (Attachments: #1 Sponsor Certificate, #2 Code for Professional Conduct Form)(Frank, Alan)
November 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Conference reset for 1/29/2020 (eo)
November 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #9 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply (eo)
November 7, 2019 Filing 9 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Brief to #5 MOTION to Compel Defendant's Motion to Compel Arbitration and Dismiss Plaintiff's Claims filed by U.S. Transport Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Frey, Timothy)
November 7, 2019 Filing 8 Request for Continuance of Case Management Conference by Jay Enterprises, Inc.. . (Frank, Alan)
November 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Conference set for 12/30/2019 09:15 AM before Honorable John E. Jones III. See attached court calendar. The 4 dates attibuted to each trial term must be utilized when completing the JCMP.(eo)
October 28, 2019 Filing 6 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #5 MOTION to Compel Defendant's Motion to Compel Arbitration and Dismiss Plaintiff's Claims filed by Jay Enterprises, Inc..(Frank, Alan)
October 28, 2019 DOCKET ANNOTATION: Counsel is advised to refile their Brief in Support to Document 5 as a seperate document. This event can be located under Responses and Replies. (aaa)
October 28, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION to Compel Defendant's Motion to Compel Arbitration and Dismiss Plaintiff's Claims by Jay Enterprises, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Memo, #3 Table of Contents, #4 Exhibit(s) A, #5 Exhibit(s) B, #6 Exhibit(s) C, #7 Certificate of Service)(Frank, Alan)
October 9, 2019 Filing 4 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on Jay Brenner on October 7, 2019, filed by U.S. Transport Corporation. (Frey, Timothy)
September 17, 2019 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by U.S. Transport Corporation identifying Corporate Parent 98 Holdings, Inc. for U.S. Transport Corporation.. (Frey, Timothy)
September 17, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Jay Enterprises, Inc. and provided TO ATTORNEY ELECTRONICALLY VIA ECF for service on Defendant(s)in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS RECEIVING THE SUMMONS ELECTRONICALLY: You must print the summons and the attachment when you receive it in your e-mail and serve them with the complaint on all defendants in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure). (Attachments: #1 Summons Packet) (aaa)
September 17, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Jay Enterprises, Inc. ( Filing fee $400, Receipt Number 0314-4874367), filed by U.S. Transport Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(aaa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: U.S. Transport Corporation v. Jay Enterprises, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jay Enterprises, Inc.
Represented By: Alan L. Frank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: U.S. Transport Corporation
Represented By: Timothy L Frey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?