Ziadeh v. Comenity Bank et al
Plaintiff: Issa G. Ziadeh
Defendant: Comenity Bank, Sterling Jewelers Inc., Farukh Bhutta and Comenity LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv01623
Filed: September 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Susan E Schwab
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 22, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 5, 2019 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to All Defendants and provided TO ATTORNEY ELECTRONICALLY VIA ECF for service on Defendant(s)in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS RECEIVING THE SUMMONS ELECTRONICALLY: You must print the summons and the attachment when you receive it in your e-mail and serve them with the complaint on all defendants in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure). (Attachments: #1 Summons Packet) (aaa)
October 30, 2019 Filing 6 STIPULATION of Dismissal as to Comenity Bank and Comenity LLC and Address Update filed by Issa G. Ziadeh (aaa)
October 17, 2019 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned by Issa G. Ziadeh. Sterling Jewelers Inc. waiver sent on 9/24/2019, answer due 11/25/2019. (pjr)
September 20, 2019 Receipt of payment from Law Offices of Issa G. Ziadeh in the amount of $400.00 for CIVIL FILING FEE. Transaction posted on 9/19/2019. Receipt number 111024383 processed by rweida. (tp)
September 19, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to All Defendants and provided TO PLAINTIFF VIA U.S. MAIL for service on Defendant(s)in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS RECEIVING THE SUMMONS ELECTRONICALLY: You must print the summons and the attachment when you receive it in your e-mail and serve them with the complaint on all defendants in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure). (Attachments: #1 Summons Packet) (dmn)
September 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 STANDING PRACTICE ORDER informing the parties of their briefing and other responsibilities.Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan E. Schwab on 9/19/19. (Attachments: #1 285 Service Packet with IFP Notice)(dmn)
September 19, 2019 Filing 2 PRO SE LETTER ISSUED. (dmn)
September 19, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $400, Receipt Number 111024383), filed by Issa G. Ziadeh. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(dmn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ziadeh v. Comenity Bank et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Comenity Bank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sterling Jewelers Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Farukh Bhutta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Comenity LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Issa G. Ziadeh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?