Carr v. Warren et al
Plaintiff: Donald Carr
Defendant: C.O. McCoy, C.O. Brennon, John Doe (1), C.O. Kodack, C.O. Evans, David Warren, C.O. Chowares and C.O. Randall
Case Number: 1:2019cv01698
Filed: September 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: EBC
Referring Judge: John E Jones
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 26, 2019 Filing 12 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned by C.O. Kodack, C.O. Randall, C.O. Evans, David Warren, C.O. Brennon, C.O. Chowares, C.O. McCoy. C.O. Kodack waiver sent on 10/28/2019, answer due 12/27/2019; C.O. Randall waiver sent on 10/28/2019, answer due 12/27/2019; C.O. Evans waiver sent on 10/28/2019, answer due 12/27/2019; David Warren waiver sent on 10/28/2019, answer due 12/27/2019; C.O. Brennon waiver sent on 10/28/2019, answer due 12/27/2019; C.O. Chowares waiver sent on 10/28/2019, answer due 12/27/2019; C.O. McCoy waiver sent on 10/28/2019, answer due 12/27/2019. (Bowers, Anthony)
November 26, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Anthony R. Bowers on behalf of C.O. Brennon, C.O. Chowares, C.O. Evans, C.O. Kodack, C.O. McCoy, C.O. Randall, David Warren (Bowers, Anthony)
November 26, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION for Discovery filed by Donald Carr.(mfa)
October 28, 2019 Filing 9 Waiver of Service forms (AO 398 and 399) Mailed to C.O. Brennon, C.O. Chowares, C.O. Evans, C.O. Kodack, C.O. McCoy, C.O. Randall, David Warren Waiver of Service due by 11/27/2019. WAIVERS NOT SENT TO JOHN DOE(1) DUE TO NO NAME. (Attachments: #1 Mailing Labels)(mfa)
October 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER DIRECTING THE CLERK'S OFFICE TO SEND AO 398 AND 399 WAIVERS FORMS to defendants. ; granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperisSigned by Honorable John E. Jones, III on 10/28/19. (mfa)
October 4, 2019 Filing 7 MEMORANDUM OF LAW by Donald Carr re #1 Complaint (Lodged with Motion for IFP). (kpf)
October 2, 2019 Filing 6 PRO SE LETTER ISSUED w/ Notice & Consent Form. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Consent) (lp)
October 2, 2019 Filing 5 STANDING PRACTICE ORDER Signed by Honorable Yvette Kane on 02/08/2011. (lp)
October 2, 2019 Filing 4 U.S. MARSHAL - 285, AO 398 and AO 399 Service Forms Completed by Plaintiff. (lp)
October 2, 2019 Filing 3 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Donald Carr. (lp)
October 2, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis including certification by Donald Carr.(lp)
October 2, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants lodged pending the disposition of the Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, filed by Donald Carr.(lp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Carr v. Warren et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C.O. McCoy
Represented By: Anthony R. Bowers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C.O. Brennon
Represented By: Anthony R. Bowers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe (1)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C.O. Kodack
Represented By: Anthony R. Bowers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C.O. Evans
Represented By: Anthony R. Bowers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Warren
Represented By: Anthony R. Bowers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C.O. Chowares
Represented By: Anthony R. Bowers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C.O. Randall
Represented By: Anthony R. Bowers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donald Carr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?