Citizens Insurance Company of America v. Pengate Handling Systems, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Citizens Insurance Company of America
Defendant: James Yeatts, Peter S. Higgins and Associates, Ridgurak, Inc., National Distribution Centers, LLC, Peter Higgins, P.E., GMSS Installers, Inc., Pengate Handling Systems, Inc., Yeatts Consultant and Jim Yeats
Case Number: 1:2019cv01797
Filed: October 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: John E Jones
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 6, 2019 Filing 17 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Citizens Insurance Company of America. James Yeatts served on 11/28/2019, answer due 12/19/2019; Yeatts Consultant served on 11/28/2019, answer due 12/19/2019. (Ehrhart, Nicole)
December 5, 2019 Filing 16 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned by Citizens Insurance Company of America. GMSS Installers, Inc. waiver sent on 11/27/2019, answer due 1/27/2020. (Ehrhart, Nicole)
November 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER The joint case management plans in these cases SHALL BE FILED by orbefore December 19, 2019. (eo)
November 18, 2019 Filing 14 SPECIAL ADMISSIONS FORM APPROVED as to John J. Delany III (eo)
November 15, 2019 DOCKET ANNOTATION: Petitioning attorney and associate counsel's bar status verified. (aaa)
November 15, 2019 Filing 13 PETITION FOR SPECIAL ADMISSION (PRO HAC VICE) by John J. Delany on behalf of Ridgurak, Inc. Attorney John Delany is seeking special admission. Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0314-4929709., filed by on behalf of Ridgurak, Inc..(Delany, John)
November 14, 2019 Filing 12 SPECIAL ADMISSIONS FORM APPROVED as to William J. Ricci (eo)
November 14, 2019 DOCKET ANNOTATION: Petition #8 for Special Admission, Petitioner and associate counsel bar status verified. (rw)
November 14, 2019 Filing 11 Supplement by Pengate Handling Systems, Inc.. to #8 Petition for Special Admission - Pro Hac Vice Signed Code of Professional Conduct. (Ricci, William)
November 13, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by John J. Delany on behalf of Ridgurak, Inc. (Delany, John)
November 13, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew P. Campbell on behalf of Ridgurak, Inc. (Campbell, Andrew)
November 12, 2019 DOCKET ANNOTATION: Counsel is advised to file a Supplement to Document 8. Signed Code of Professional Conduct needs submitted. (aaa)
November 12, 2019 Filing 8 PETITION FOR SPECIAL ADMISSION (PRO HAC VICE) by William J. Ricci on behalf of Pengate Handling Systems, Inc. Attorney William Ricci is seeking special admission. Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0314-4925423.. (Ricci, William)
November 11, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by William J. Ricci on behalf of Pengate Handling Systems, Inc. (Ricci, William)
November 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Conference set for 12/30/2019 11:15 AM before Honorable John E. Jones III. See attached court calendar. The 4 dates attibuted to each trial term must be utilized when completing the JCMP.(eo)
October 28, 2019 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned by Citizens Insurance Company of America. National Distribution Centers, LLC waiver sent on 10/25/2019, answer due 12/24/2019. (Ehrhart, Nicole)
October 21, 2019 Filing 4 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO FRCP 7.1 by Citizens Insurance Company of America. (Ehrhart, Nicole)
October 16, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to All Defendants and provided TO ATTORNEY ELECTRONICALLY VIA ECF for service on Defendant(s)in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS RECEIVING THE SUMMONS ELECTRONICALLY: You must print the summons and the attachment when you receive it in your e-mail and serve them with the complaint on all defendants in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure). (Attachments: #1 Summons Packet) (aaa)
October 16, 2019 Filing 2 EXHIBITS filed by Citizens Insurance Company of America. (Attachments: #1 A-1, #2 A-2, #3 A-3, #4 A-4, #5 A-5, #6 B)(aaa)
October 16, 2019 Filing 1 DECLARATORY JUDGMENT COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $400, Receipt Number 0314-4900333), filed by Citizens Insurance Company of America. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(aaa) Modified on 10/16/2019 (aaa).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Citizens Insurance Company of America v. Pengate Handling Systems, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Yeatts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Peter S. Higgins and Associates
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ridgurak, Inc.
Represented By: John J. Delany
Represented By: Andrew P. Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Distribution Centers, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Peter Higgins, P.E.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GMSS Installers, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pengate Handling Systems, Inc.
Represented By: William J. Ricci
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yeatts Consultant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jim Yeats
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Citizens Insurance Company of America
Represented By: Nicole M. Ehrhart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?