Platt v. Graham et al
Plaintiff: Brian Platt
Defendant: James Graham, R. Clem Malot, David Bolton, Pennsylvania Municipal Code Alliance, INC, New Oxford Borough and Abbotstown Borough
Case Number: 1:2019cv01829
Filed: October 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Martin C Carlson
Referring Judge: Christopher C Conner
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 31 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER - Sets forth case management instructions, guidelines & pretrial & trial schedule, inc. - Fact Discovery due by 4/30/2020; Motions in Limine due by 9/3/20; Final Pretrial Conference set for 10/21/2020 @ 02:30 PM in Harrisburg Jury Room #2; Jury Selection & Trial set for 11/2/2020 @ 09:30 AM in Harrisburg - Courtroom 2; Dispositive Motions due by 6/3/2020; Pretrial Memos due by noon on 10/14/2020. (See order for complete details.)Signed by Chief Judge Christopher C. Conner on 12/18/19. (ki)
December 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER following a telephone conference - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT: 1. On or before December 23, 2019, after a review of the documents at issue, the dfts shall notify the court of any objections to the use of this information by the pltf. 2. Recognizing that the pltf intends to file a 2nd amended complaint if permitted to use the documents, the parties have stipulated that the pltf shall be permitted to file a 2nd amended complaint without prejudice to the dfts filing a dispositive motion related to that 2nd amended complaint; and 3. In the event that the information at issue is not discoverable, and the pltf does not file a 2nd amended complaint, the parties have stipulated that dfts may file a dispositive motion related to the 1st amended complaint (Doc. #22 ) on or before January 6, 2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Martin C. Carlson on December 13, 2019. (kjn
December 11, 2019 Filing 27 CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN by Brian Platt. (Benion, Jason)
December 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Martin C. Carlson for the purpose of resolving the parties' pending discovery dispute. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan E. Schwab on 12/11/2019. (ktt)
December 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER: 1. Dfts mtn #18 to dismiss the complaint #1 is DENIED as moot and without prejudice.2. Dfts shall respond to the amended complaint #22 in accordance with the FRCP.Signed by Chief Judge Christopher C. Conner on 12/6/19. (ma)
December 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER REFERRING case to Chief Magistrate Judge Schwab for referral of matters to U.S. Magistrate JudgeSigned by Chief Judge Christopher C. Conner on 12/6/19. (ma)
December 3, 2019 Filing 23 Letter from Counsel for Plaintiff Requesting a Conference with the Court. (Benion, Jason)
December 3, 2019 Filing 22 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Brian Platt. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Exhibit(s) B, #3 Exhibit(s) C, #4 Exhibit(s) D, #5 Exhibit(s) E, #6 Exhibit(s) F, #7 Exhibit(s) G)(Benion, Jason)
November 20, 2019 Filing 21 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #18 MOTION to Dismiss filed by James Graham, R. Clem Malot, New Oxford Borough, Pennsylvania Municipal Code Alliance, INC.(Kroll, Rolf)
November 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 SCHEDULING ORDER setting Initial Case Management Conference for 12/18/2019 @ 10:00 AM - Counsel for Plaintiff(s) shall initiate the telephone conference call to Chambers. (See order for complete details.) Signed by Chief Judge Christopher C. Conner on 11/18/19. (ki)
November 13, 2019 Filing 19 Proposed Pretrial Order. (pjr)
November 12, 2019 DOCKET ANNOTATION: Counsel is advised to file a proposed order for document 18. (mfa)
November 12, 2019 Filing 18 MOTION to Dismiss by James Graham, R. Clem Malot, New Oxford Borough, Pennsylvania Municipal Code Alliance, INC.(Kroll, Rolf)
November 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting defts Abbottstown Borough & David Bolton's motion #15 for ext of time to respond to pltf's complaint until 12/12/2019. (See order for complete details.) Signed by Chief Judge Christopher C. Conner on 11/12/19. (ki)
November 12, 2019 DOCKET ANNOTATION: Attorneys Lawrence Stengel and Morgan Hays are advised that the special admissions form can be found at http://www.pamd.uscourts.gov/forms/petition-admission-practice (mfa)
November 11, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Rolf E. Kroll on behalf of James Graham, Pennsylvania Municipal Code Alliance, INC (Kroll, Rolf)
November 11, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Abbotstown Borough, David Bolton. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Conley, Brian)
November 11, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael G Crotty on behalf of Abbotstown Borough, David Bolton (Crotty, Michael)
November 11, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Brian C Conley on behalf of Abbotstown Borough, David Bolton (Conley, Brian)
November 11, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Morgan S Hays on behalf of Brian Platt. (Hays, Morgan)
November 11, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Lawrence F Stengel on behalf of Brian Platt. (Stengel, Lawrence)
November 11, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Rolf E. Kroll on behalf of R. Clem Malot, New Oxford Borough (Kroll, Rolf)
October 29, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Brian Platt. Abbotstown Borough served on 10/22/2019, answer due 11/12/2019. (Benion, Jason)
October 29, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Brian Platt. David Bolton served on 10/22/2019, answer due 11/12/2019. (Benion, Jason)
October 29, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Brian Platt. New Oxford Borough served on 10/22/2019, answer due 11/12/2019. (Benion, Jason)
October 29, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Brian Platt. Pennsylvania Municipal Code Alliance, INC served on 10/22/2019, answer due 11/12/2019. (Benion, Jason)
October 29, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Brian Platt. R. Clem Malot served on 10/22/2019, answer due 11/12/2019. (Benion, Jason)
October 29, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Brian Platt. James Graham served on 10/22/2019, answer due 11/12/2019. (Benion, Jason)
October 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER - Letter to Counsel from Court Re: Case Assignment and Procedures. (See order for complete details.) Signed by Chief Judge Christopher C. Conner on 10/22/19. (ki)
October 22, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to All Defendants and provided TO ATTORNEY ELECTRONICALLY VIA ECF for service on Defendant(s)in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS RECEIVING THE SUMMONS ELECTRONICALLY: You must print the summons and the attachment when you receive it in your e-mail and serve them with the complaint on all defendants in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure). (Attachments: #1 Summons Packet) (mfa)
October 22, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $400, Receipt Number 0314-4905323), filed by Brian Platt. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit(s), #3 Exhibit(s), #4 Exhibit(s), #5 Exhibit(s), #6 Exhibit(s), #7 Exhibit(s), #8 Exhibit(s))(mfa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Platt v. Graham et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Graham
Represented By: Rolf E. Kroll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R. Clem Malot
Represented By: Rolf E. Kroll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Bolton
Represented By: Brian C Conley
Represented By: Michael G Crotty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pennsylvania Municipal Code Alliance, INC
Represented By: Rolf E. Kroll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New Oxford Borough
Represented By: Rolf E. Kroll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Abbotstown Borough
Represented By: Brian C Conley
Represented By: Michael G Crotty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian Platt
Represented By: Jason G. Benion
Represented By: Lawrence F. Stengel
Represented By: Morgan S. Hays
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?