McClenton v. Doe (1) Ms. Ryan et al
Plaintiff: Michael McClenton
Defendant: John Doe 6 (Mr. Gutsie), Jane Doe (1) Ms. Ryan, Jane Doe 5 (C. Stanitis), Jane Doe 2 (Ms. Wadsworth), John Doe 4 (Mr. Cavenas) and John Doe 3 (Mr. Roberts)
Case Number: 1:2019cv01958
Filed: November 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: EB
Referring Judge: Sylvia H Rambo
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 20, 2019 Receipt of payment from MICHAEL MCCLENTON KD4418 in the amount of $400.00 for CIVIL FILING FEE. Transaction posted on 12/19/2019. Receipt number 333069185 processed by epetrosk. (jjs)
December 20, 2019 Filing 15 Waiver of Service forms (AO 398 and 399) Mailed to All Defendants Waiver of Service due by 1/21/2020. (Attachments: #1 Mailing Labels)(mfa)
December 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER DIRECTING THE CLERK'S OFFICE TO SEND AO 398 AND 399 WAIVERS FORMS to defendants. Signed by Honorable Sylvia H. Rambo on 12/19/2019. (mfa)
December 19, 2019 Filing 13 Filing fee: $ 400.00, receipt number 333069185. Complaint is now deemed FILED. (ep)
November 25, 2019 Filing 12 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement filed on behalf of Michael McClenton. (ao)
November 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER denying pltf's mtns for lv to proceed ifp #2 and #9 . Pltf is directed to pay the filing fee withing 30 days of this order. Failure to pay the filing fee may result in dismissal of this action.Signed by Honorable Sylvia H. Rambo on 11/21/19. (ma)
November 18, 2019 Filing 10 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Michael McClenton. (kpf)
November 18, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Michael McClenton.(kpf)
November 18, 2019 Filing 8 Letter from Michael McClenton providing application for IFP and prisoner's account balance. (kpf)
November 14, 2019 Filing 7 FIFTEEN (15) DAY ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER - Within 15 days of the date of this Order, the superintendent or warden of the institution at which Plaintiff is currently incarcerated is directed to provide certified copies of the statement of Plaintiff's trust fund account to this Court and to the Plaintiff. The statement should reflect all activity in that account for the six-month period immediately preceding the lodging of the complaint in this action.Signed by LP on 11/14/2019. Order sent to Superintendent and plaintiff. (lp)
November 14, 2019 Filing 6 STANDING PRACTICE ORDER Signed by Honorable Yvette Kane on 02/08/2011. (Attachments: #1 0285)(lp)
November 14, 2019 Filing 5 PRO SE LETTER ISSUED w/ Notice & Consent Form. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Consent) (lp)
November 14, 2019 Filing 4 PA DOC DC-43 Integrated Correctional Plan by Michael McClenton.. (lp)
November 14, 2019 Filing 3 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Michael McClenton. (lp)
November 14, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Michael McClenton.(lp)
November 14, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants lodged pending the disposition of the Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, filed by Michael McClenton.(lp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McClenton v. Doe (1) Ms. Ryan et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe 6 (Mr. Gutsie)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Doe (1) Ms. Ryan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Doe 5 (C. Stanitis)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Doe 2 (Ms. Wadsworth)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe 4 (Mr. Cavenas)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe 3 (Mr. Roberts)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael McClenton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?