Mumma v. Double M Real Estate, LLC et al
Petitioner: Robert M Mumma, II
Respondent: Pennsy Supply, Inc. and Double M Real Estate, LLC
Trustee: Markian R. Slobodian and U.S. Trustee
Case Number: 1:2020cv00017
Filed: January 6, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Sylvia H Rambo
Referring Judge: Jennifer P Wilson
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Withdrawl
Cause of Action: 28:0157
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 27, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER denying #10 Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Honorable Jennifer P. Wilson on 2/27/2020 (ve)
February 12, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION for Reconsideration re #8 Order (memorandum filed previously as separate docket entry) #7 Memorandum (Order to follow as separate docket entry) filed by Robert M Mumma, II.(mfa)
February 6, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE OF ELECTION to retain represented counsel filed by Robert M Mumma, II re #5 Order. (mfa)
January 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER (memorandum filed previously as separate docket entry) - IT IS ORDERED that the motion to withdraw the reference filed by Movant Robert M. Mumma, II (Doc. 1) is DENIED. The Clerk of Court is accordingly directed to close this case. Signed by Honorable Jennifer P. Wilson on 1/31/2020. (ve)
January 31, 2020 Filing 7 MEMORANDUM (Order to follow as separate docket entry) re #1 Withdraw the Reference. Signed by Honorable Jennifer P. Wilson on 1/31/2020. (ve)
January 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER - IT IS ORDERED that a case status conference is scheduled for February 19, 2020 at 11:30 a.m. The conference will be by telephone. Counsel for Appellee Double M Development shall initiate the call by calling chambers at (717) 221-3970 after all parties are on the line. SEE ORDER FOR FURTHER DETAILS. Signed by Honorable Jennifer P. Wilson on 1/24/2020. (ve)
January 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER - IT IS ORDERED that no later than 5:00 p.m. on February 6, 2020, Appellant Robert M. Mumma, II shall notify the court and opposing counsel as to his election to either retain represented counsel or proceed in the above captioned matters as an unrepresented litigant. Mr. Mumma may make such an election by filing a letter on the dockets of the above captioned matters. If Mr. Mumma fails to file such an election by the above deadline, the court will construe his silence as an election to proceed as an unrepresented litigant. There will be no extensions of the above deadline. Signed by Honorable Jennifer P. Wilson on 1/24/2020. (ve)
January 20, 2020 Filing 4 OBJECTIONS by Double M Real Estate, LLC. to #1 Withdraw the Reference . (Young, Lawrence)
January 15, 2020 Filing 3 OBJECTIONS by Markian R. Slobodian. to #1 Withdraw the Reference . (Slobodian, Markian)
January 9, 2020 Filing 2 Letter to Counsel re: Case Assignment and Procedures. Signed by Honorable Jennifer P. Wilson on 1/9/2020. (ve)
January 8, 2020 DOCKET ANNOTATION: This case has been reassigned to Judge Wilson. (mfa)
January 7, 2020 DOCKET ANNOTATION: This case has been reassigned to Judge Kane. (mfa)
January 6, 2020 Filing 1 MOTION TO WITHDRAW THE REFERENCE Bankruptcy Court case number 1:17-bk-01334 HWV. Bankruptcy Judge Presiding Over Bankruptcy Case Judge Henry Van Eck. (Attachments: #1 District Court Docket)(BK Court W-B 1, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mumma v. Double M Real Estate, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Pennsy Supply, Inc.
Represented By: Matthew Myers Haar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Double M Real Estate, LLC
Represented By: Lawrence V. Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Trustee: Markian R. Slobodian
Represented By: Markian R. Slobodian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Trustee: U.S. Trustee
Represented By: Gregory Benjamin Schiller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Robert M Mumma, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?