Securities and Exchange Commission v. Mahan
Plaintiff: Securities and Exchange Commission
Defendant: David M. Mahan
Case Number: 1:2020cv00487
Filed: March 26, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: John E Jones
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Cause of Action: 15:77
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 1, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 1, 2020 Filing 6 FINAL JUDGMENT in favor of Securities and Exchange Commission against David M. Mahan. See document for details. (eo)
March 31, 2020 Filing 5 SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT Consent of Defendant David M. Mahan by Securities and Exchange Commission. (Attachments: #1 Final Judgment)(Green, Julia)
March 30, 2020 Filing 4 SPECIAL ADMISSIONS FORM APPROVED as to Julia Green Signed by Honorable John E. Jones, III on 3/30/2020. (mfa)
March 26, 2020 DOCKET ANNOTATION: Petitioner, Julia Green, and Associate Counsel bar status verified. (pjr)
March 26, 2020 Filing 3 PETITION FOR SPECIAL ADMISSION (PRO HAC VICE) by Julia C Green on behalf of Securities and Exchange Commission Attorney Julia C. Green is seeking special admission.. (Green, Julia)
March 26, 2020 SPECIAL ADMISSION FORM for Julia Green, Jennifer Barry, Scott Thompson & Megan Ryan can be obtained at http://www.pamd.uscourts.gov/forms/petition-admission-practice. (pjr)
March 26, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to David M. Mahan and provided TO ATTORNEY ELECTRONICALLY VIA ECF for service on Defendant(s)in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS RECEIVING THE SUMMONS ELECTRONICALLY: You must print the summons and the attachment when you receive it in your e-mail and serve them with the complaint on all defendants in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure). (pjr)
March 26, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against David M. Mahan, filed by Securities and Exchange Commission. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(pjr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Securities and Exchange Commission v. Mahan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Securities and Exchange Commission
Represented By: Megan Ryan
Represented By: Scott A. Thompson
Represented By: Jennifer C. Barry
Represented By: Julia C Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David M. Mahan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?