Lawson et al v. Pennsylvania College of Technology
Plaintiff: Michael James Lawson, Jr. and Tara Lawson
Defendant: Pennsylvania College of Technology
Case Number: 1:2020cv00736
Filed: May 5, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Yvette Kane
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 8, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 8, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Cory S. Winter on behalf of Pennsylvania College of Technology (Winter, Cory)
June 8, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by James A. Keller on behalf of Pennsylvania College of Technology (Keller, James)
June 1, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Austin White on behalf of Pennsylvania College of Technology (White, Austin)
May 29, 2020 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned by Pennsylvania College of Technology. Pennsylvania College of Technology waiver sent on 5/27/2020, answer due 7/27/2020. (Bluth, Brian)
May 29, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Brian J. Bluth on behalf of Pennsylvania College of Technology (Bluth, Brian)
May 27, 2020 Filing 7 SPECIAL ADMISSIONS FORM APPROVED as to Roy T. Willey, IV.Signed by Honorable Yvette Kane on 5/27/20. (dmn)
May 27, 2020 DOCKET ANNOTATION: Petitioning attorney and associate counsel's bar status verified. (aaa)
May 26, 2020 Filing 6 PETITION FOR SPECIAL ADMISSION (PRO HAC VICE) by Roy T Willey, IV on behalf of All Plaintiffs Attorney Roy Willey IV is seeking special admission. Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0314-5103147.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Willey, Roy)
May 26, 2020 Filing 5 SPECIAL ADMISSIONS FORM APPROVED as to Eric M. Poulin.Signed by Honorable Yvette Kane on 5/26/20. (dmn)
May 26, 2020 DOCKET ANNOTATION: Petitioning attorney and associate counsel bar status verified. (aaa)
May 26, 2020 Filing 4 PETITION FOR SPECIAL ADMISSION (PRO HAC VICE) by Eric M Poulin on behalf of Michael James Lawson, Jr, Tara Lawson Attorney Eric Poulin is seeking special admission. Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0314-5102630.. (Poulin, Eric)
May 7, 2020 Filing 3 Letter to Counsel re: Case Assignment and Procedures.Signed by Honorable Yvette Kane on 5/7/20. (dmn)
May 5, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Pennsylvania College of Technology and provided TO ATTORNEY ELECTRONICALLY VIA ECF for service on Defendant(s)in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS RECEIVING THE SUMMONS ELECTRONICALLY: You must print the summons and the attachment when you receive it in your e-mail and serve them with the complaint on all defendants in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure). (Attachments: #1 Summons Packet) (aaa)
May 5, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Pennsylvania College of Technology ( Filing fee $400, Receipt Number 0314-5084095), filed by Michael James Lawson, Jr, Tara Lawson. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(aaa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lawson et al v. Pennsylvania College of Technology
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael James Lawson, Jr.
Represented By: Stuart A. Carpey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tara Lawson
Represented By: Stuart A. Carpey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pennsylvania College of Technology
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?