Balkar v. Barr et al
Petitioner: Singh Balkar
Respondent: Chad Wolf, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Immigration & Customs Enforcement, Warden Clair Doll, William Barr and Simona Flores-Lund
Case Number: 1:2020cv00896
Filed: June 3, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: EBC
Referring Judge: John E Jones
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus - Alien Detainees
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 30, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 30, 2020 Filing 6 RESPONSE TO PETITION FOR HABEAS CORPUS by William Barr, Clair Doll, Simona Flores-Lund, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Immigration & Customs Enforcement, Chad Wolf by William Barr, Clair Doll, Simona Flores-Lund, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Immigration & Customs Enforcement, Chad Wolf. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s), #2 Unpublished Opinion(s))(Sanderson, Joanne)
July 15, 2020 Filing 5 SHOW CAUSE ORDER and Petition Served on Susan Melendez (eo)
July 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE- 1. The Clerk of Court is directed to SERVE copies of the petition (Doc. 1), and this order on Respondents and the United States Attorney. See R. GOVERNING 2254 CASES R.1(b) (applicable to petitions under 28 U.S.C. 2241 in the discretion of the court). All documents filed by the parties and by the court shall be served upon the United States Attorney.2. Respondents shall FILE, within twenty-one (21) days from the date ofthis Order, a response to the petition, which shall contain the relevant facts and procedural history of the case, a recommended disposition of the petition, and citations to pertinent case law.3.Pertinent portions of the record of the immigration proceedings shall accompany the response.4. Petitioner shall be permitted to FILE, within fourteen (14) days of the date on which the answer is filed, a reply to the answer. See R. GOVERNING 2254 CASES R. 1(b), 5(e).5.The Court will decide whether to hold a hearing on the basis of the petition, Respondents answer, and, if filed, Petitioners reply.(eo)
June 12, 2020 Receipt of payment from BALKAR SINGH in the amount of $5.00 for WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS. Transaction posted on 6/11/2020. Receipt number 111025592 processed by aarlidge. (tp)
June 3, 2020 Filing 3 THIRTY (30) DAY ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER directing the petitioner to pay the filing fee or file a signed Application to Proceed IFP within 30 days or case will be dismissed. Signed by LP on 06/03/2020. (Attachments: #1 IFP (habeas corpus))(lp)
June 3, 2020 Filing 2 PRO SE LETTER ISSUED w/ Notice & Consent Form. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Consent) (lp)
June 3, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus lodged as no filing fee was paid and no Motion for In Forma Pauperis was filed, filed by Singh Balkar.(lp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Balkar v. Barr et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Chad Wolf
Represented By: Joseph J Terz
Represented By: Joanne M. Sanderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: U.S. Department of Homeland Security
Represented By: Joseph J Terz
Represented By: Joanne M. Sanderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: U.S. Immigration & Customs Enforcement
Represented By: Joseph J Terz
Represented By: Joanne M. Sanderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Warden Clair Doll
Represented By: Joseph J Terz
Represented By: Joanne M. Sanderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: William Barr
Represented By: Joseph J Terz
Represented By: Joanne M. Sanderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Simona Flores-Lund
Represented By: Joseph J Terz
Represented By: Joanne M. Sanderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Singh Balkar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?