Meeker Equipment Company, Inc v. Smith Hauling, Inc
Plaintiff: Meeker Equipment Company, Inc
Defendant: Smith Hauling, Inc, Magna Service Agency, Inc. and Atlantic Permits and Surveys, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2020cv00909
Filed: June 4, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Christopher C Conner
Nature of Suit: Commerce ICC Rates, Etc.
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 27, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER finding as moot #3 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Smith Hauling's motion (Doc. #3 ) to dismiss the complaint (Doc. 1-2) is DENIED as moot and without prejudice. Signed by Honorable Christopher C. Conner on 7/27/2020 (ktt)
July 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 SCHEDULING ORDER - #17 Unopposed MOTION to Continue Case Management Conference filed by Meeker Equipment Company, Inc is GRANTED. Case Management Conference set for 9/21/2020 at 10:00 AM before Honorable Christopher C. Conner. Signed by Honorable Christopher C. Conner on 7/27/2020. (ktt)
July 24, 2020 DOCKET ANNOTATION: Counsel is advised to file a proposed order for Doc. 17. (pjr)
July 24, 2020 Filing 17 Unopposed MOTION to Continue Case Management Conference by Meeker Equipment Company, Inc.(Levenson, Lauren)
July 20, 2020 Filing 16 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Smith Hauling, Inc, Magna Service Agency, Inc., Atlantic Permits and Surveys, Inc. filed by Meeker Equipment Company, Inc.(ktt)
July 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #12 Motion for Leave to File. Signed by Honorable Christopher C. Conner on 7/20/2020 (ktt)
July 16, 2020 Filing 14 CERTIFICATE of Counsel re #12 First MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint Certificate of Concurrence by Robert Michael Palumbi on behalf of Meeker Equipment Company, Inc (Palumbi, Robert)
July 16, 2020 Filing 13 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #12 First MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint filed by Meeker Equipment Company, Inc.(Palumbi, Robert)
July 16, 2020 DOCKET ANNOTATION: Counsel is advised to file a certificate of concurrence or non-concurrence as to Doc. 12. (ktt)
July 16, 2020 DOCKET ANNOTATION: Counsel is advised to file the brief in support of Doc. 12 as a separate entry using the event: Civil Events - Responses and Replies - Brief in Support. (ktt)
July 16, 2020 Filing 12 First MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint by Meeker Equipment Company, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Memo Memorandum in Support of Motion for Leave, #2 Exhibit(s) Proposed Amended Complaint, #3 Proposed Order Proposed Order re Motion for Leave)(Palumbi, Robert)
July 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER - ORDERED that plaintiff shall respond to defendant's motion (Doc. 3) on or before Thursday, July 16, 2020, or the court will deem the motion to be unopposed. Signed by Honorable Christopher C. Conner on 7/9/2020. (ktt)
June 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #9 Motion to Extend Time. Signed by Honorable Christopher C. Conner on 6/18/2020 (ktt)
June 18, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION for Extension of Time to to File Reply to Brief in Opposition to Motion to Dismiss of Defendant by Meeker Equipment Company, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Palumbi, Robert)
June 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Conference set for 7/27/2020 at 10:15 AM before Honorable Christopher C. Conner. SEE ORDER FOR COMPLETE DETAILS. Signed by Honorable Christopher C. Conner on 6/16/2020. (ktt) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/16/2020: #1 Court Calendar) (ktt).
June 8, 2020 Filing 7 SPECIAL ADMISSIONS FORM APPROVED as to Dennis J. Kusturiss. Signed by Honorable Christopher C. Conner on 6/8/2020. (ktt)
June 8, 2020 DOCKET ANNOTATION: Petitioner Dennis J. Kusturiss and Associate Counsel bar status verified (mfa)
June 8, 2020 Filing 6 PETITION FOR SPECIAL ADMISSION (PRO HAC VICE) by Dennis J Kusturiss on behalf of Smith Hauling, Inc Attorney Dennis J. Kusturiss is seeking special admission. Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0314-5114312.. (Kusturiss, Dennis)
June 4, 2020 Filing 5 CASE ASSIGNMENT ORDER -Signed by Honorable Christopher C. Conner on 6/4/2020. (ktt)
June 4, 2020 Filing 4 MEMORANDUM OF LAW by Smith Hauling, Inc re #1 Notice of Removal, #3 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM . (Kusturiss, Dennis)
June 4, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Smith Hauling, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Kusturiss, Dennis)
June 4, 2020 Filing 2 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO FRCP 7.1 by Smith Hauling, Inc. (Kusturiss, Dennis)
June 4, 2020 DOCKET ANNOTATION: Attorney Dennis Kusturiss is advised that the special admissions form can be found at http://www.pamd.uscourts.gov/forms/petition-admission-practice (mfa)
June 4, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Smith Hauling, Inc (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0314-5111531), filed by Smith Hauling, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit(s))(mfa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Meeker Equipment Company, Inc v. Smith Hauling, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Meeker Equipment Company, Inc
Represented By: Robert M. Palumbi
Represented By: Robert Michael Palumbi
Represented By: Lauren Levenson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Smith Hauling, Inc
Represented By: Dennis J Kusturiss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Magna Service Agency, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Atlantic Permits and Surveys, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?