Singh v. Hoover et al
Plaintiff: Navin Singh
Defendant: Lt. Powell, Reynolds, Simona Flores, Joseph Dunn, L. Francis Cissna, Lt. Probst, Deputy Superintendent Kormanic, Angela Hoover, Jennifer Moon, William Barr and Lt. Gates
Petitioner: Ajarhi Roberts
Case Number: 1:2020cv01011
Filed: June 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Jennifer P Wilson
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Civil Rights (Prison Conditions)
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 12, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER adopting #10 Report and Recommendations. Plaintiffs complaint (Doc. 1) is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. The Clerk of Court is directed to close this case.Signed by Honorable Jennifer P. Wilson on 8/12/2020 (ve)
July 16, 2020 Filing 10 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re #1 Complaint filed by Navin Singh - IT IS RECOMMENDED that this complaint be dismissed without prejudice to renewal if the plaintiff ever comes into compliance with the local rules. Objections to R&R due by 7/30/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Martin C. Carlson on July 16, 2020. (kjn)
July 15, 2020 Filing 9 Mail Returned (Doc #4) as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Navin Singh (ao)
July 6, 2020 Filing 8 Mail sent to Navin Singh returned as undeliverable. Envelope marked "RTS, Not Deliverable as Addressed, Unable to Forward." (rw)
July 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER re #6 Mail Returned - IT OS ORDERED that the plaintiff comply with Local Rule 83.18 on or before July 24, 2020 or face the sanction provided under that rule, dismissal of this case. Signed by Magistrate Judge Martin C. Carlson on July 6, 2020. (kjn)
July 2, 2020 Filing 6 Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail #4 sent to Navin Singh (ep)
June 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER re: pre-trial management. 1. On or before July 24, 2020, each individual plaintiff must pay the filing fee prescribed by law, or submit a motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis. 2. In addition, on or before July 24, 2020 each individual plaintiff must submit a complaint to the court describing that plaintiffs claims. Signed by Magistrate Judge Martin C. Carlson on June 23, 2020. (kjn)
June 22, 2020 Filing 4 (THIRTY (30) DAY ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER) directing the prisoner to pay the filing fee or file a signed Application to Proceed IFP within 30 days or case will be dismissed.Signed by lp on 06/22/2020. (Attachments: #1 IFP (civil rights))(lp)
June 22, 2020 Filing 3 PRO SE LETTER ISSUED w/ Notice & Consent Form. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Consent, #2 NEW PRISONER PACK ATTACHED) (lp)
June 22, 2020 VERBAL ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Carlson. (jw)
June 19, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against William Barr, L. Francis Cissna, Joseph Dunn, Simona Flores, Lt. Gates, Angela Hoover, Deputy Superintendent Kormanic, Jennifer Moon, Lt. Powell, Lt. Probst, Reynolds lodged as no filing fee was paid and no Motion for In Forma Pauperis was filed, filed by Navin Singh.(bg) Modified on 6/22/2020 (bg).
June 19, 2020 Filing 2 Application Request for Enlargement of Page Numbers or Words inTRO, filed by Navin Singh.(mfa) Modified on 6/20/2020 (lp).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Singh v. Hoover et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lt. Powell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Reynolds
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Simona Flores
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph Dunn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: L. Francis Cissna
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lt. Probst
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deputy Superintendent Kormanic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Angela Hoover
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jennifer Moon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Barr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lt. Gates
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Ajarhi Roberts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Navin Singh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?