HUGGINS v. DELBALSO et al
Petitioner: JARVIN MALIK HUGGINS
Respondent: The District Attorney of the County of Schuylkill, ., The Attorney General of the State of Pennsylvania and Theresa Delbalso
Case Number: 1:2020cv01225
Filed: July 16, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: MA
Referring Judge: Sylvia H Rambo
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 21, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 21, 2020 Filing 5 THIRTY (30) DAY ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER directing the prisoner to pay the filing fee or file a signed Application to Proceed IFP within 30 days or case will be dismissed. Signed by LP on 07/21/2020. (Attachments: #1 IFP (habeas corpus))(lp)
July 17, 2020 Filing 4 PRO SE LETTER ISSUED w/ Notice. (pjr)
July 16, 2020 Filing 3 Case transferred electronically in from District of Pennsylvania Eastern; Case Number 2:20-cv-03392 containing electronic documents. JW
July 16, 2020 Original record transferred to the Middle District of Pennsylvania via interdistrict transfer system. (md, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 7/16/2020.]
July 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER THAT THE CLERK OF COURT IS DIRECTED TO TRANSFER FORTHWITH THE ABOVE-CAPTIONED CASE TO THE UNITED STATES DISTRICT COURT FOR THE MIDDLE DISTRICT OF PENNSYLVANIA AND CLOSE THIS CASE. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOHN M. YOUNGE ON 7/15/20. 7/15/20 ENTERED. NOT MAILED TO HUGGINS.(fdc) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 7/16/2020.]
July 14, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by JARVIN MALIK HUGGINS. (NO FEE PAID; NO IFP FIED) (Attachments: #1 Case Management Track Form, #2 Designation Form)(bw, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 7/16/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: HUGGINS v. DELBALSO et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: The District Attorney of the County of Schuylkill, .
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: The Attorney General of the State of Pennsylvania
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Theresa Delbalso
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: JARVIN MALIK HUGGINS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?