Springs v. Quay
Plaintiff: Eric Lebron Springs
Respondent: Warden H. Quay
Case Number: 1:2020cv01229
Filed: July 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: EB
Referring Judge: Sylvia H Rambo
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 28, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER STAYING CASE pending the Third Circuits decisions in Copes and Corley.Signed by Honorable Sylvia H. Rambo on 8/28/20. (ma)
August 19, 2020 Filing 9 RESPONSE TO PETITION FOR HABEAS CORPUS by Warden H. Quay by Warden H. Quay. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s), #2 Unpublished Opinion(s))(Jani, Navin)
August 3, 2020 Filing 8 CERTIFIED Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Eric Lebron Springs. (ep) Modified on 8/4/2020 (lp).
July 31, 2020 Filing 7 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement re Eric Lebron Springs. (bg)
July 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: 1. Petrs mtn for lv to proceed ifp #3 is GRANTED;2. The Court exercises its discretion under Rule 1(b) of the Rules Governing Section 2254 Cases in the United States District Courts, 28 U.S.C. foll. 2254, to apply those rules to this 2241 petition;3. The Clerk of Court is directed to serve a copy of the petn (Doc. No. 1), memorandum in support (Doc. No. 2), and this Order on the Resp and the US Atty, and to note the address of the US Atty on the front of the docket sheet in this case. 4. Within (20) days of the date of this Order, Resp shall file an answer, motion, or other response to the allegations of the petition. 5. Petr shall, if he so desires, file a reply to the Resps answer or other pleading within (14) days after its filing. 6. A determination as to whether Petr shall be produced for a hearing will be held in abeyance pending the filing of the Resps answer or other pleading.Signed by Honorable Sylvia H. Rambo on 7/30/20. (ma)
July 17, 2020 Filing 5 FIFTEEN (15) DAY ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER - Within 15 days of the date of this Order, the superintendent or warden of the institution at which Petitioner is currently incarcerated is directed to provide certified copies of the statement of Petitioner's trust fund account to this Court and to the Petitioner. The statement should reflect all activity in that account for the six-month period immediately preceding the lodging of the complaint in this action. Order sent to Superintendent and Petitioner. Signed by LP on 07/17/2020. (lp)
July 17, 2020 Filing 4 PRO SE LETTER ISSUED w/ Notice & Consent Form. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Consent) (lp)
July 17, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Eric Lebron Springs.(lp)
July 17, 2020 Filing 2 MEMORANDUM in Support of Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Eric Lebron Springs. (lp)
July 17, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus lodged pending the disposition of the Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, filed by Eric Lebron Springs.(lp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Springs v. Quay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eric Lebron Springs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Warden H. Quay
Represented By: Joseph J Terz
Represented By: Navin Jani
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?