Strike 3 Holdings, LLC v. John Doe subscriber assigned IP address 174.55.82.15
Plaintiff: Strike 3 Holdings, LLC
Defendant: John Doe subscriber assigned IP address 174
Case Number: 1:2020cv01322
Filed: July 31, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Yvette Kane
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 11, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER - AND NOW, on this 11th day of September 2020, IT IS ORDERED THAT:1. Finding that good cause for Plaintiffs request exists and that Plaintiffs request is consistent with precedent, see, e.g., Malibu Media LLC v. Doe, No. 14-0166, 2014 WL 575305 (M.D. Pa. Feb. 11, 2014), Plaintiffs motion for leave to serve a third-party subpoena prior to a Rule 26(f) conference (Doc. No. 6), is GRANTED, subject to the following conditions: SEE ORDER FOR FURTHER DETAILS.Signed by Honorable Yvette Kane on 9/11/20. (dmn)
August 18, 2020 DOCKET ANNOTATION: Doc. 5 deleted and refiled as Docs. 6 & 7. (pjr)
August 18, 2020 Filing 7 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #6 MOTION for Leave to File Third Party Subpoena filed by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Exhibit(s) B, #3 Exhibit(s) C, #4 Appendix)(Saruya, Jason)
August 18, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to File Third Party Subpoena by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Saruya, Jason)
August 18, 2020 DOCKET ANNOTATION: Counsel is advised to refile Doc. 5. Motion is not part of the filing. Documents should be separated and Brief in Support should be filed as a separate entry using the event: Civil Events Motions and Related Filings Responses and Replies (Briefs)- Brief in Support (Do not use for Summary Judgment Motions). (pjr)
August 4, 2020 Filing 4 List of Copyrights sent to Register of Copyright. (Attachments: #1 List of copyrights)(pjr)
July 31, 2020 Filing 3 Letter to Counsel re: Case Assignment and Procedures.Signed by Honorable Yvette Kane on 7/31/20. (dmn)
July 31, 2020 Filing 2 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO FRCP 7.1 by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC identifying Corporate Parent General Media Systems, LLC for Strike 3 Holdings, LLC. (Saruya, Jason)
July 31, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against John Doe subscriber assigned IP address 174.55.82.15 ( Filing fee $400, Receipt Number APAMDC-5186994), filed by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit)(pjr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Strike 3 Holdings, LLC v. John Doe subscriber assigned IP address 174.55.82.15
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Strike 3 Holdings, LLC
Represented By: Jason M. Saruya
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe subscriber assigned IP address 174
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?