Strike 3 Holdings, LLC v. John Doe subscriber assigned IP address 73.130.61.38
Plaintiff: Strike 3 Holdings, LLC
Defendant: John Doe subscriber assigned IP address 73.130.61.38
Case Number: 1:2020cv01324
Filed: July 31, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Christopher C Conner
Referring Judge: Jennifer P Wilson
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 24, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #6 Motion for Leave to Serve a Third-Party Subpoena. See order for further details. Signed by Honorable Jennifer P. Wilson on 8/24/2020 (ve)
August 18, 2020 Filing 7 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #6 MOTION for Leave to File Third Party Subpoena filed by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Exhibit(s) B, #3 Exhibit(s) C, #4 Appendix)(Saruya, Jason)
August 18, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to File Third Party Subpoena by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Saruya, Jason)
August 17, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to File Third Party Subpoena by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC.(Saruya, Jason) Modified on 8/24/2020 (ve).
August 4, 2020 Filing 4 List of Copyrights sent to Register of Copyright. (Attachments: #1 List of copyrights)(pjr)
August 3, 2020 Filing 3 Letter to Counsel re: Case Assignment and Procedures. Signed by Honorable Jennifer P. Wilson. (ve)
July 31, 2020 DOCKET ANNOTATION: This case has been assigned to Judge Wilson. (jw)
July 31, 2020 Filing 2 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO FRCP 7.1 by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC identifying Corporate Parent General Media Systems, LLC for Strike 3 Holdings, LLC. (Saruya, Jason)
July 31, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against John Doe subscriber assigned IP address 73.130.61.38 ( Filing fee $400, Receipt Number APAMDC-5187043), filed by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Letters re PSR, #2 Exhibit)(pjr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Strike 3 Holdings, LLC v. John Doe subscriber assigned IP address 73.130.61.38
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe subscriber assigned IP address 73.130.61.38
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Strike 3 Holdings, LLC
Represented By: Jason M. Saruya
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?