Kenneth v. Derry Township School District et al
Plaintiff: Dr. Taylor Kenneth
Defendant: Derry Township School District, Terry Singer, Derry Township Board of School Directors, Maria Memmi, Kathy Sicher, Lindsay Drew, Donna Cronin, David Obnstine, John/Jane Doe 1-10, Tricia Steiner and ABC Entities 1-10
Case Number: 1:2020cv01363
Filed: August 3, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Christopher C Conner
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 7, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Conference set for 11/30/2020 at 10:15 AM before Honorable Christopher C. Conner. Signed by Honorable Christopher C. Conner on 9/28/2020. (Attachments: #1 Term. Calendar)(ktt)
September 16, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Anthony T. Lucido on behalf of David Obnstine (Lucido, Anthony)
September 9, 2020 Filing 11 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned by Taylor Kenneth. Donna Cronin waiver sent on 9/8/2020, answer due 11/9/2020; Lindsay Drew waiver sent on 9/8/2020, answer due 11/9/2020; Maria Memmi waiver sent on 9/8/2020, answer due 11/9/2020; Kathy Sicher waiver sent on 9/8/2020, answer due 11/9/2020; Terry Singer waiver sent on 9/8/2020, answer due 11/9/2020; Tricia Steiner waiver sent on 9/8/2020, answer due 11/9/2020. (Attachments: #1 AO 398 and 399 Waiver Forms, #2 AO 398 and 399 Waiver Forms, #3 AO 398 and 399 Waiver Forms, #4 AO 398 and 399 Waiver Forms, #5 AO 398 and 399 Waiver Forms)(Farsiou, Steven)
September 2, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Justin D. Barbetta on behalf of Donna Cronin, Lindsay Drew, Maria Memmi, Kathy Sicher, Terry Singer, Tricia Steiner (Barbetta, Justin)
September 2, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Ellis H. Katz on behalf of Donna Cronin, Lindsay Drew, Maria Memmi, Kathy Sicher, Terry Singer, Tricia Steiner (Katz, Ellis)
September 2, 2020 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned by Taylor Kenneth. David Obnstine waiver sent on 9/2/2020, answer due 11/2/2020. (Farsiou, Steven)
September 1, 2020 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned by Taylor Kenneth. Derry Township Board of School Directors waiver sent on 8/20/2020, answer due 10/19/2020; Derry Township School District waiver sent on 8/20/2020, answer due 10/19/2020. (Attachments: #1 AO 398 and 399 Forms)(Farsiou, Steven)
August 27, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher J. Conrad on behalf of Derry Township Board of School Directors, Derry Township School District (Conrad, Christopher)
August 10, 2020 Filing 5 SPECIAL ADMISSIONS FORM APPROVED as to Steven D. Farsiou. Signed by Honorable Christopher C. Conner on 8/10/2020. (ktt)
August 10, 2020 Filing 4 PETITION FOR SPECIAL ADMISSION (PRO HAC VICE) by Frank P. Clark on behalf of All Plaintiffs Attorney Steven Farsiou is seeking special admission. Filing fee $ 50, receipt number APAMDC-5199585.. (Clark, Frank)
August 10, 2020 DOCKET ANNOTATION: Petitioner, Steven Farsiou, and Associate Counsel bar status verified. (pjr)
August 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER Re: Case Assignment and Procedures - Signed by Honorable Christopher C. Conner on 8/5/2020. (ktt)
August 4, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Donna Cronin, Derry Township Board of School Directors, Derry Township School District, Lindsay Drew, Maria Memmi, David Obnstine, Kathy Sicher, Terry Singer, Tricia Steiner and provided TO ATTORNEY ELECTRONICALLY VIA ECF for service on Defendant(s)in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS RECEIVING THE SUMMONS ELECTRONICALLY: You must print the summons and the attachment when you receive it in your e-mail and serve them with the complaint on all defendants in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure). (Attachments: #1 Summons Packet) (pjr)
August 4, 2020 DOCKET ANNOTATION: Counsel is advised to refile Petition for Special Admission using the event: Civil Events Other Filings Other Documents-Includes Social Security Transcript and Brief Events - Petition for Special Admission - Pro Hac Vice. (pjr)
August 3, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $400, Receipt Number BPAMDC-5190273), filed by Taylor Kenneth. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(pjr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kenneth v. Derry Township School District et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dr. Taylor Kenneth
Represented By: Steven D. Farsiou
Represented By: Frank P. Clark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Derry Township School District
Represented By: Christopher J. Conrad
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Terry Singer
Represented By: Justin D. Barbetta
Represented By: Ellis H. Katz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Derry Township Board of School Directors
Represented By: Christopher J. Conrad
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maria Memmi
Represented By: Justin D. Barbetta
Represented By: Ellis H. Katz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kathy Sicher
Represented By: Justin D. Barbetta
Represented By: Ellis H. Katz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lindsay Drew
Represented By: Justin D. Barbetta
Represented By: Ellis H. Katz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donna Cronin
Represented By: Justin D. Barbetta
Represented By: Ellis H. Katz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Obnstine
Represented By: Anthony T. Lucido
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John/Jane Doe 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tricia Steiner
Represented By: Justin D. Barbetta
Represented By: Ellis H. Katz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABC Entities 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?