Rozzell v. Saul
Plaintiff: Tracy Rozzell
Defendant: Andrew M. Saul
Case Number: 1:2020cv01458
Filed: August 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Susan E Schwab
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 15, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 15, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Tracy Rozzell. Andrew M. Saul served on 9/15/2020, answer due 11/16/2020. (Attachments: #1 certified mail receipt AUSA, #2 Certified Mail Receipts SSA, #3 Certificate mail receipt AG)(Arnold, Beth)
September 17, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Samuel S Dalke on behalf of Andrew M. Saul. (Dalke, Samuel)
August 17, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Andrew M. Saul and provided TO ATTORNEY ELECTRONICALLY VIA ECF for service on Defendant(s)in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS RECEIVING THE SUMMONS ELECTRONICALLY: You must print the summons and the attachment when you receive it in your e-mail and serve them with the complaint on all defendants in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure). (Attachments: #1 Summons Packet) (rw)
August 17, 2020 Filing 2 STANDING PRACTICE ORDER 13-9 in Social Security Appeals. (rw)
August 17, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Andrew M. Saul ( Filing fee $400, Receipt Number BPAMDC-5210004), filed by Tracy Rozzell. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(rw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rozzell v. Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew M. Saul
Represented By: Samuel S Dalke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tracy Rozzell
Represented By: Beth Arnold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?