Huynh v. Barr et al
Petitioner: Cuong Huynh
Respondent: John Doe, Martha Doe, Catricia Howard and William Barr
Case Number: 1:2020cv01460
Filed: August 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Office: Harrisburg Office
Presiding Judge: Martin C Carlson
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 17, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 17, 2020 DOCKET ANNOTATION: Petitioner's "Verified Statement of Jurisdictional Facts" has been sent to the Eastern District of Virginia. (ga)
September 1, 2020 Filing 6 Mail sent #3 to Mr. Huynh. Returned as Undeliverable - Attempted Not Known. Unable to Forward. (kpf)
August 20, 2020 DOCKET ANNOTATION: Case transferred from Pennsylvania Middle has been opened in Eastern District of Virginia - as case 3:20-cv-00652, filed 08/20/2020. (jw)
August 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER - For the reasons set forth in the accompanying Memorandum Opinion, IT ISORDERED that this case be transferred to the United States District Court for theEastern District of Virginia for further proceedings. Signed by Magistrate Judge Martin C. Carlson on August 18, 2020. (kjn)
August 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 MEMORANDUM OPINION re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus(Lodged No FF and No Motion for IFP Filed) filed by Cuong Huynh - For the foregoing reasons, IT IS ORDERED that this case be transferred to the United States District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia for further proceedings. Signed by Magistrate Judge Martin C. Carlson on August 18, 2020. (kjn)
August 18, 2020 Filing 3 THIRTY (30) DAY ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER directing the prisoner to pay the filing fee or file a signed Application to Proceed IFP within 30 days or case will be dismissed. Signed by LP on 08/18/2020. (Attachments: #1 IFP (habeas corpus))(lp)
August 18, 2020 Filing 2 PRO SE LETTER ISSUED. (lp)
August 18, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus lodged as no filing fee was paid and no Motion for In Forma Pauperis was filed, filed by Cuong Huynh.(lp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Huynh v. Barr et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Martha Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Catricia Howard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: William Barr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Cuong Huynh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?