Ruffin v. Wolfe et al
Plaintiff: Cleo Ruffin
Defendant: Governor Tom Wolfe, Secretary John E. Wetzel, K. Kauffman and Secretary Rachel Levine
Case Number: 1:2020cv01461
Filed: August 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Susan E Schwab
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 7, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 7, 2020 Receipt of payment from CLEO RUFFIN in the amount of $2.88 for PLRA CIVIL FILING FEE. Transaction posted on 10/5/2020. Receipt number 333073245 processed by gangeli. (jjs)
September 28, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey M. Paladina on behalf of All Defendants (Paladina, Jeffrey)
September 28, 2020 Filing 13 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned by John E. Wetzel, Rachel Levine, Tom Wolfe, K. Kauffman. John E. Wetzel waiver sent on 8/31/2020, answer due 10/30/2020; Rachel Levine waiver sent on 8/31/2020, answer due 10/30/2020; Tom Wolfe waiver sent on 8/31/2020, answer due 10/30/2020; K. Kauffman waiver sent on 8/31/2020, answer due 10/30/2020. (Paladina, Jeffrey)
September 3, 2020 Filing 12 Letter from Clerk of Court to inmate re incomplete IFP w (Attachments: #1 IFP Form) (sm)
September 2, 2020 Filing 11 U.S. MARSHAL - Service Forms Completed by Plaintiff. (bg)
September 2, 2020 Filing 10 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Cleo Ruffin. (bg)
September 2, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Cleo Ruffin.(bg)
August 31, 2020 Filing 8 Waiver of Service forms (AO 398 and 399) Mailed to K. Kauffman, Rachel Levine, John E. Wetzel, Tom Wolfe w/ courtesy copies to PA Atty General. Waiver of Service due by 9/30/2020. (Attachments: #1 Labels)(ki)
August 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER DIRECTING THE CLERK'S OFFICE TO SEND AO 398 AND 399 WAIVERS FORMS to defendants - Pltf's app #2 to proceed IFP GRANTED; pltf to pay full filing fee w/ supt @ place of confinement to sent funds per instructions; Clrk of Ct to send copy of this order to supt @ institution where pltf is confined; Complaint deemed filed; Clrk of Ct to serve copy of complaint, notice & request to waive service form, waiver of service form & this order on named defts; if service unable to be completed due to pltf's failure to properly name defts or provide accurate mailing address pltf will be req'd to correct this deficiency... (See order for complete details.) Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan E. Schwab on 8/31/20. (ki)
August 18, 2020 Filing 6 THIRTY (30) DAY ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER directing the prisoner to pay the filing fee or file a signed Application to Proceed IFP within 30 days or case will be dismissed. Signed by LP on 08/18/2020. (Attachments: #1 IFP (civil rights), #2 Instruction Sheet, #3 Federal & Local Rules, #4 398 Form, #5 399 Form)(lp)
August 17, 2020 Filing 5 U.S. MARSHAL 285 FORM to be attached to when served by USM. (rw)
August 17, 2020 Filing 4 PRO SE LETTER ISSUED w/ Notice & Consent Form. (rw)
August 17, 2020 Filing 3 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement filed by Cleo Ruffin. (rw)
August 17, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Cleo Ruffin.(rw)
August 17, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants lodged pending the disposition of the Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, filed by Cleo Ruffin.(rw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ruffin v. Wolfe et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Governor Tom Wolfe
Represented By: Jeffrey M. Paladina
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Secretary John E. Wetzel
Represented By: Jeffrey M. Paladina
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: K. Kauffman
Represented By: Jeffrey M. Paladina
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Secretary Rachel Levine
Represented By: Jeffrey M. Paladina
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cleo Ruffin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?