Brown v. Quay
Petitioner: Roberto Brown
Respondent: H. Quay
Case Number: 1:2020cv01463
Filed: August 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: EB
Referring Judge: Sylvia H Rambo
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 7, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER - In accord with the accompanying Memorandum #7 : 1. Petrs petition for a writ of habeas corpus pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 2241 (Doc. No. 1) is DENIED; and2. The Clerk of Court is directed to CLOSE the above-captioned case.Signed by Honorable Sylvia H. Rambo on 10/7/20. (ma)
October 7, 2020 Filing 7 MEMORANDUM re Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus #1 (Order to follow as separate docket entry)Signed by Honorable Sylvia H. Rambo on 10/7/20. (ma)
September 14, 2020 Filing 6 RESPONSE TO PETITION FOR HABEAS CORPUS by H. Quay by H. Quay. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s))(Dalke, Samuel)
August 25, 2020 Filing 5 SHOW CAUSE ORDER and Petition Served on USA Office Harrisburg by email. (ma)
August 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: Show Cause Response due by 9/15/2020.Signed by Honorable Sylvia H. Rambo on 8/25/20. (ma)
August 24, 2020 Receipt of payment from ROBERTO BROWN in the amount of $5.00 for WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS. Transaction posted on 8/21/2020. Receipt number 333072641 processed by gangeli. (jjs)
August 18, 2020 Filing 3 THIRTY (30) DAY ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER directing the petitioner to pay the filing fee or file a signed Application to Proceed IFP within 30 days or case will be dismissed. Signed by LP on 08/18/2020. (Attachments: #1 IFP (habeas corpus))(lp)
August 18, 2020 Filing 2 PRO SE LETTER ISSUED w/ Notice & Consent Form. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Consent) (lp)
August 18, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus lodged as no filing fee was paid and no Motion for In Forma Pauperis was filed, filed by Roberto Brown. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Saiyd Muhammad)(lp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brown v. Quay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Roberto Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: H. Quay
Represented By: Joseph J Terz
Represented By: Samuel S Dalke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?