Plaza v. Smith et al
Petitioner: Francis Timothy Plaza
Respondent: Pennsylvania Attorney General's Office, Barry Smith and York County District Attorney
Case Number: 1:2020cv01480
Filed: August 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: EBC
Referring Judge: John E Jones
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 7, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE- 1. The Clerk of Court is directed to SERVE copies of the petition (Doc.1), Memorandum of Law (Doc. 5), and Exhibits (Docs. 5-1, 5-2), onRespondents and the District Attorney of York County. See R.Governing 2254 Cases R. 4.2. The Clerk of Court is further directed to NOTE the address of theDistrict Attorney of York County on the docket sheet.3. Respondents shall FILE an answer and memorandum concerning thetimeliness of the petition and any applicable statutory and/or equitabletolling of the statute of limitations on or before October 27, 2020.4. Any pertinent state court documents shall be included withRespondents answer and memorandum.5. Petitioner may file a reply on or before November 10, 2020.(eo)
September 30, 2020 Filing 5 MEMORANDUM OF LAW by Francis Timothy Plaza re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. (Attachments: #1 Part 2, #2 Part 3)(kpf)
September 8, 2020 Filing 4 Mail sent #2 to Mr. Plaza. Returned as Undeliverable - Inmate Paroled. (kpf)
August 28, 2020 Receipt of payment from FRANCIS PLAZA in the amount of $5.00 for WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS. Transaction posted on 8/27/2020. Receipt number 333072707 processed by gangeli. (jjs)
August 19, 2020 Filing 3 THIRTY (30) DAY ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER directing the petitioner to pay the filing fee or file a signed Application to Proceed IFP within 30 days or case will be dismissed. Signed by LP on 08/19/2020. (Attachments: #1 IFP (habeas corpus))(lp)
August 19, 2020 Filing 2 PRO SE LETTER ISSUED w/ Notice & Consent Form. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Consent) (lp)
August 19, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus lodged as no filing fee was paid and no Motion for In Forma Pauperis was filed, filed by Francis Timothy Plaza.(lp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Plaza v. Smith et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Francis Timothy Plaza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Pennsylvania Attorney General's Office
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Barry Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: York County District Attorney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?