Comacho v. Quay
Petitioner: Juan Hurtado Comacho
Respondent: H. Quay
Case Number: 1:2020cv01481
Filed: August 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: EB
Referring Judge: Sylvia H Rambo
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 30, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting resp's mtn for exttm #8 to Respond to habeas petition. Show Cause Response due by 11/4/2020.Signed by Honorable Sylvia H. Rambo on 9/30/20. (ma)
September 30, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION for Extension of Time to 30 day extension until November 4, 2020 to Respond to habeas petition by H. Quay. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Haken, Tamara)
September 16, 2020 Filing 7 SHOW CAUSE ORDER and Petition Served on USA Office Harrisburg by personal service. (ma)
September 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER denying petr's mtn to appoint cnsl #2 .Signed by Honorable Sylvia H. Rambo on 9/15/20. (ma)
September 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Show Cause Response due by 10/6/2020. Petr shall, if he so desires, file a reply to the Resps answer or other pleading within (14) days after its filing.Signed by Honorable Sylvia H. Rambo on 9/15/20. (ma)
September 15, 2020 Receipt of payment from JUAN HURTADO-COMACHO in the amount of $5.00 for WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS. Transaction posted on 9/14/2020. Receipt number 333072989 processed by gangeli. (jjs)
August 19, 2020 Filing 4 THIRTY (30) DAY ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER directing the petitioner to pay the filing fee or file a signed Application to Proceed IFP within 30 days or case will be dismissed. Signed by LP on 08/19/2020. (Attachments: #1 IFP (habeas corpus))(lp)
August 19, 2020 Filing 3 PRO SE LETTER ISSUED w/ Notice & Consent Form. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Consent) (lp)
August 19, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Juan Hurtado Comacho.(lp)
August 19, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus lodged as no filing fee was paid and no Motion for In Forma Pauperis was filed, filed by Juan Hurtado Comacho.(lp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Comacho v. Quay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Juan Hurtado Comacho
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: H. Quay
Represented By: Tamara J Haken
Represented By: Joseph J Terz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?