Lubinski v. Colvin
Plaintiff: Joseph W. Lubinski
Defendant: Carolyn W. Colvin and Andrew Saul
Case Number: 1:2020cv01485
Filed: August 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Susan E Schwab
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 24, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 24, 2020 Filing 8 ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE Executed as to #5 Summons Issued as to USA. Atty eneral rec'd on 9/21/20. (ao)
September 24, 2020 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed Andrew Saul served on 9/23/2020, answer due 11/23/2020. (ao)
September 24, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Timothy S. Judge on behalf of Andrew Saul. (Judge, Timothy)
August 24, 2020 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Andrew Saul and provided TO U.S. MARSHAL for service on Defendant(s)in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS RECEIVING THE SUMMONS ELECTRONICALLY: You must print the summons and the attachment when you receive it in your e-mail and serve them with the complaint on all defendants in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure). (ki)
August 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting pltf's app #2 to proceed IFP, deeming complaint filed, directing Clrk of Ct to issue process to USM who is directed to serve pltf's complaint in acc w/ FRCP 4(i) w/in 14 days, & directing that deft shall serve & file an answer w/ a certified copy of the transcript of the administrative record w/in 60 days of service of the complaint. (See order for complete details.) Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan E. Schwab on 8/24/20. (ki)
August 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 STANDING PRACTICE ORDER 13-9 in Social Security Appeals.Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan E. Schwab on 08/20/20. (pjr)
August 19, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Joseph W. Lubinski. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(pjr)
August 19, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Carolyn W. Colvin lodged pending the disposition of the Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, filed by Joseph W. Lubinski. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(pjr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lubinski v. Colvin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carolyn W. Colvin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Saul
Represented By: Timothy S. Judge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph W. Lubinski
Represented By: F. Michael Friedman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?