Davenport v. Capio Partners LLC
Plaintiff: Anniken U. Davonport and Anniken U. Davenport
Defendant: Capio Partners LLC
Case Number: 1:2020cv01700
Filed: September 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Yvette Kane
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 28, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 SCHEDULING ORDER: A Case Management conference will be conducted by the court on January 15, 2021 at 10:00 a.m. The court prefers to hold this conference by telephone. Plaintiffs counsel shall initiate this telephone conference. The telephone number of the court is 717-221-3990. Counsel are advised to comply with Rule 16.3(a) of the Rules of Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania. Local Rule 16.3 requires lead counsel for each party to meet prior to the case management conference and complete a Joint Case Management Plan form. The completed form, which is set forth in Appendix A of the local rules, must be filed jointly by the parties on or before January 8, 2021. SEE ORDER FOR FURTHER DETAILS.Signed by Honorable Yvette Kane on 11/5/20. (dmn)
November 4, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE by Capio Partners LLC Notice of Firm Name Change (Easley, Aaron)
November 4, 2020 Filing 11 BRIEF IN OPPOSITION re #10 MOTION for Leave to File a Supplemental Brief filed by Capio Partners LLC.(Easley, Aaron)
November 4, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION for Leave to File a Supplemental Brief by Anniken U. Davenport. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Memorandum of Law, #3 Certificate of Nonconcurrence, #4 Certificate of Service, #5 Proposed Order)(Howell, Steven)
October 29, 2020 Filing 9 REPLY BRIEF re #5 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Capio Partners LLC.(Easley, Aaron)
October 26, 2020 Filing 8 BRIEF IN OPPOSITION re #5 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Anniken U. Davenport. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s), #2 Proposed Order)(Howell, Steven)
October 16, 2020 Filing 7 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #5 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Capio Partners LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Easley, Aaron)
October 16, 2020 Filing 6 Certification by Capio Partners LLC. #5 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , Docket Annotation,, . (Easley, Aaron)
October 16, 2020 DOCKET ANNOTATION: Counsel is advised that a certificate of concurrence/non concurrence needs to be filed as to document #5 using the event document filed, located in: Other Filings > Other Documents-Includes Social Security Transcript and Brief Events > Document Filed. Counsel is further advised to file the Memorandum in Support of document #5 as a separate entry using the event brief in support, located in: Motions and Related Filings > Motions Responses and Replies (Briefs)> Brief in Support. (rw)
October 12, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Capio Partners LLC. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Proposed Order)(Easley, Aaron)
September 30, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Anniken U. Davenport. Capio Partners LLC served on 9/22/2020, answer due 10/13/2020. (Howell, Steven)
September 22, 2020 Filing 3 Letter to Counsel re: Case Assignment and Procedures.Signed by Honorable Yvette Kane on 9/22/20. (dmn)
September 18, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Capio Partners LLC and provided TO ATTORNEY ELECTRONICALLY VIA ECF for service on Defendant(s)in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS RECEIVING THE SUMMONS ELECTRONICALLY: You must print the summons and the attachment when you receive it in your e-mail and serve them with the complaint on all defendants in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure). (Attachments: #1 Summons Packet) (rw)
September 18, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Capio Partners LLC ( Filing fee $400, Receipt Number APAMDC5260232), filed by Anniken U. Davenport. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit(s))(rw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Davenport v. Capio Partners LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anniken U. Davonport
Represented By: Steven Howell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anniken U. Davenport
Represented By: Steven Howell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Capio Partners LLC
Represented By: Aaron R. Easley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?