Strike 3 Holdings, LLC v. John Doe subscriber assigned IP address 98.117.12.231
Plaintiff: Strike 3 Holdings, LLC
Defendant: John Doe subscriber assigned IP address 98.117.12.231
Case Number: 1:2020cv01937
Filed: October 21, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Yvette Kane
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #5 - AND NOW, on this 14th day of December 2020, IT IS ORDERED THAT: 1. Finding that good cause for Plaintiff Strike 3 Holdings, LLC (Plaintiff)s request exists and that Plaintiffs request is consistent with precedent, see, e.g., Malibu Media LLC v. Doe, No. 1:14-cv-0166, 2014 WL 575305, at *3-4 (M.D. Pa. Feb. 11, 2014), Plaintiffs motion for leave to serve a third-party subpoena prior to a Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 26(f) conference (Doc. No. 5) is GRANTED, subject to the following conditions: SEE ORDER FOR FURTHER DETAILS. Signed by Honorable Yvette Kane on 12/14/20 (dmn)
December 4, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to File Ex Parte Motion For Leave to File Third Party Subpoena by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Appendix Unpublished Cases, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Memo)(Saruya, Jason)
October 26, 2020 Filing 4 Letter to Counsel re: Case Assignment and Procedures.Signed by Honorable Yvette Kane on 10/26/20. (dmn)
October 21, 2020 Filing 3 Report to Register of Copyrights. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(rw)
October 21, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to John Doe subscriber assigned IP address 98.117.12.231 and provided TO ATTORNEY ELECTRONICALLY VIA ECF for service on Defendant(s)in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS RECEIVING THE SUMMONS ELECTRONICALLY: You must print the summons and the attachment when you receive it in your e-mail and serve them with the complaint on all defendants in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure). (Attachments: #1 Summons Packet) (rw)
October 21, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against John Doe subscriber assigned IP address 98.117.12.231 ( Filing fee $400, Receipt Number APAMDC-5307675), filed by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit(s))(rw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Strike 3 Holdings, LLC v. John Doe subscriber assigned IP address 98.117.12.231
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Strike 3 Holdings, LLC
Represented By: Jason Saruya
Represented By: Jason M. Saruya
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe subscriber assigned IP address 98.117.12.231
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?