Roberson v. Department of US Navy et al
Plaintiff: Jain-Miecell Irvin Roberson
Defendant: Branch Health Clinic - Marine Corps, Cynthia E. Abair, Department of Veteran Affairs, Air Station Miramar and Department of US Navy
Case Number: 1:2020cv02058
Filed: November 6, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Susan E Schwab
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 18, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 18, 2020 Filing 7 ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE Executed US Navy Judge Advocate General Norfolk, on 28 November 2020 Acknowledgement filed by Jain-Miecell Irvin Roberson. (Roberson, Jain-Miecell)
November 25, 2020 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT of Service for AO 440 US Navy JAG served on Unknown - Signature required USPS certified mail on 11/17/2020, filed by Jain-Miecell Irvin Roberson. (Attachments: #1 Summons Screenshot of USPS Tracking Pages)(Roberson, Jain-Miecell)
November 25, 2020 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT of Service for AO 440 Department of Veteran Affairs General Council served on Unknown - Signature Required Certified Mail on 11/18/2020, filed by Jain-Miecell Irvin Roberson. (Roberson, Jain-Miecell)
November 16, 2020 Receipt of payment from JAIN MIECELL IVRIN ROBERSON in the amount of $400.00 for CIVIL FILING FEE. Transaction posted on 11/12/2020. Receipt number 111026290 processed by aarlidge. (jjs)
November 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER directing pltf to, w/in 90 days of date he filed the complaint, to serve the summons & complaint on defts in acc. w/ FRCP 4 or obtain waivers of service & file returns of service w/in 90 days of date complaint filed. (See order for complete details.) Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan E. Schwab on 11/13/20. (ki)
November 6, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to All Defendants and provided TO PRO SE PLAINTIFF VIA U.S. MAIL for service on Defendant(s)in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (Attachments: #1 Summons Packet) (mw)
November 6, 2020 Filing 2 PRO SE LETTER ISSUED. (mw)
November 6, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $400, Receipt Number 111), filed by Jain-Miecell Irvin Roberson. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(mw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Roberson v. Department of US Navy et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Branch Health Clinic - Marine Corps
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cynthia E. Abair
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Department of Veteran Affairs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Air Station Miramar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Department of US Navy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jain-Miecell Irvin Roberson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?