Colyer v. Wetzel et al
Petitioner: Nicholas Theodore Colyer
Respondent: John Wetzel, Josh Shapiro and PA State Attorney General
Case Number: 1:2020cv02130
Filed: November 16, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: PT
Referring Judge: Jennifer P Wilson
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 7, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER (memorandum filed previously as separate docket entry) - IT IS ORDERED THAT:1. The petition for writ of habeas corpus (Doc. 1) is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE.2. There is no basis for the issuance of a certificate of appealability in this matter. See 28 U.S.C. 2253(c). 3. The Clerk of Court shall CLOSE this case. Signed by Honorable Jennifer P. Wilson on 1/7/2021. (ve)
January 7, 2021 Filing 4 MEMORANDUM (Order to follow as separate docket entry) re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Nicholas Theodore Colyer. Signed by Honorable Jennifer P. Wilson on 1/7/2021. (ve)
November 17, 2020 Receipt of payment from NICHOLAS THEODORE COLYER in the amount of $5.00 for WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS. Transaction posted on 11/16/2020. Receipt number 333073811 processed by smurphy. (jjs)
November 16, 2020 Filing 3 Filing fee: $ 5.00, receipt number 333073811. Petition is now deemed FILED. (ao)
November 16, 2020 Filing 2 PRO SE LETTER ISSUED w/ Notice & Consent Form. (mw)
November 16, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus,filing fee received, filed by Nicholas Theodore Colyer.(mw) Modified on 11/16/2020 (lp).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Colyer v. Wetzel et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Nicholas Theodore Colyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: John Wetzel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Josh Shapiro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: PA State Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?