McCabe v. Mason et al
Petitioner: James Irwin McCabe
Respondent: Brenda Mason, Josh Shapiro, Pennsylvania Attorney General Office and Pennsylvania Board of Probation and Parole
Case Number: 1:2020cv02278
Filed: December 7, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: EB
Referring Judge: Sylvia H Rambo
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 3, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 3, 2021 Filing 13 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #12 MOTION for Discovery filed by James Irwin McCabe.(pjr)
February 3, 2021 Filing 12 MOTION for Discovery filed by James Irwin McCabe.(pjr)
January 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER Granting petr's mtn for exttm #10 . Petrs is directed to file his traverse to resps' response to his petn for H/C within (30) days of the date of this Order. Signed by Honorable Sylvia H. Rambo on 1/28/21. (ma)
January 28, 2021 Filing 10 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Traverse filed by James Irwin McCabe.(pjr)
January 13, 2021 Filing 9 RESPONSE TO PETITION FOR HABEAS CORPUS by Brenda Mason, Pennsylvania Board of Probation and Parole by Brenda Mason, Pennsylvania Board of Probation and Parole. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s))(Keating, Timothy)
January 8, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Timothy P. Keating on behalf of Brenda Mason, Pennsylvania Board of Probation and Parole. (Keating, Timothy)
December 29, 2020 Filing 7 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement (CERTIFIED) by James Irwin McCabe. (dw)
December 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: 1.Petrs mtn for leave to proceed ifp #2 is GRANTED, and his petn for a writ of habeas corpus pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 2254 (Doc. No. 1) is DEEMED FILED;2.The Clerk of Court is directed to add the Pennsylvania Board of Probation and Parole to the docket as a Respondent in this matter;3.The Clerk of Court is directed to serve a copy of the petn #1 and this Order on Resps Mason, the Pennsylvania Board of Probation and Parole, and the AG of PA4.Within (20) days of the date of this Order, Resps shall file a response to the allegations of the petition. 5. Petr shall, if he so desires, file a reply to Resps answer or other pleading within (14) days after its filing. and6. A determination as to whether or not the petr shall be produced for a hearing will be held in abeyance pending the filing of Respondents answer or other pleading.Signed by Honorable Sylvia H. Rambo on 12/29/20. (ma)
December 7, 2020 Filing 5 FIFTEEN (15) DAY ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER - Within 15 days of the date of this Order, the superintendent or warden of the institution at which Petitioner is currently incarcerated is directed to provide certified copies of the statement of Petitioner's trust fund account to this Court and to the Petitioner. The statement should reflect all activity in that account for the six-month period immediately preceding the lodging of the complaint in this action. Order sent to Superintendent and petitioner. Signed by LP on 12/07/2020. (lp)
December 7, 2020 Filing 4 PRO SE LETTER ISSUED w/ Notice & Consent Form. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Consent) (lp)
December 7, 2020 Filing 3 UNCERIFIED Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by James Irwin McCabe. (lp)
December 7, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (uncertified) by James Irwin McCabe.(lp)
December 7, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus lodged pending the disposition of the Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, filed by James Irwin McCabe. (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support of Petition)(lp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McCabe v. Mason et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Brenda Mason
Represented By: Timothy P. Keating
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Josh Shapiro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Pennsylvania Attorney General Office
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Pennsylvania Board of Probation and Parole
Represented By: Timothy P. Keating
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: James Irwin McCabe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?