Hartman v. Wiczkowski
Plaintiff: Mel Hartman
Defendant: Brian A. Wiczkowski
Case Number: 1:2020cv02281
Filed: December 7, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Christopher C Conner
Referring Judge: Joseph F Saporito
Nature of Suit: Torts to Land
Cause of Action: 28:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 16, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 26, 2021 Filing 4 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #1 Complaint (Lodged No FF and No Motion for IFP Filed) filed by Mel Hartman. Accordingly, we recommend that these several civil actions be dismissed without prejudice for failure to pay the requisite filing and administrative fees and that the Clerk be directed to administratively close these cases. See Lindsey v. Roman, 408 Fed. Appx 530, 53233 (3d Cir. 2010) (per curiam); Parker v. Harrisburg City, Civil No. 1:17-CV-00653, 2017 WL 3015880, at *2 (M.D. Pa. June 7, 2017) (report and recommendation), adopted by 2017 WL 3008583 (M.D. Pa. July 14, 2017). Objections to R&R due by 2/12/2021 Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph F. Saporito, Jr on 1/26/21. (ms)
January 26, 2021 VERBAL ORDER REASSIGNING CASE - Case reassigned to Honorable Christopher C. Conner and referred to Magistrate Judge Joseph F. Saporito, Jr for the filing of a Report and Recommendation. (jkc)
December 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER - plaintiff shall either pay the filing fee or complete and file the attached in forma pauperis application within 30 days of the date of this order or case will be dismissed without prejudice Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph F. Saporito, Jr on 12/10/20. (ms)
December 8, 2020 Filing 2 PRO SE LETTER ISSUED w/ Notice & Consent Form. (Attachments: #1 AO 398 and 399 Waiver Forms, #2 Excerpts of Local and Federal Rules, #3 Pro Se Prisoner Instructions for Filing a Complaint) (pjr)
December 7, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Brian A. Wiczkowski lodged as no filing fee was paid and no Motion for In Forma Pauperis was filed, filed by Mel Hartman.(pjr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hartman v. Wiczkowski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian A. Wiczkowski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mel Hartman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?