Minich v. Norfolk Southern Railway Company
Plaintiff: Jason Minich
Defendant: Norfolk Southern Railway Company
Case Number: 1:2020cv02326
Filed: December 11, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Yvette Kane
Nature of Suit: Federal Employer's Liability
Cause of Action: 45:51
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 4, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 SCHEDULING ORDER: Close of Fact Discovery shall be completed by October 29, 2021. Telephonic Post Discovery Status Conference set for 11/4/2021 10:00 AM before Honorable Yvette Kane. Plaintiff's counsel shall initiate the call to 717-221-3990. Prior to the conference, the parties shall meet and confer regarding settlement of the case. SEE ORDER FOR FURTHER DETAILS. Signed by Honorable Yvette Kane on 2/4/21. (dmn)
January 27, 2021 Filing 12 CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN by Jason Minich. (Coston, John)
January 15, 2021 Filing 11 SPECIAL ADMISSIONS FORM APPROVED as to Michael P. Rausch. Signed by Honorable Yvette Kane on 1/15/21. (dmn)
January 13, 2021 DOCKET ANNOTATION: Petitioner Michael P. Rausch and associate counsel (as to document #8 ) bar status verified (mw)
January 8, 2021 Filing 10 SPECIAL ADMISSIONS FORM APPROVED as to John H. Coston IV. Signed by Honorable Yvette Kane on 1/8/21. (dmn)
January 7, 2021 DOCKET ANNOTATION: Petitioner and associate counsel (as to document #9 ) bar status verified. (rw)
January 7, 2021 Filing 9 PETITION FOR SPECIAL ADMISSION (PRO HAC VICE) by Michael Rausch on behalf of Jason Minich Attorney John H. Coston, IV is seeking special admission. Filing fee $ 50, receipt number APAMDC-5418701.. (Rausch, Michael)
January 6, 2021 Filing 8 PETITION FOR SPECIAL ADMISSION (PRO HAC VICE) by Michael Rausch on behalf of Jason Minich Attorney Michael Rausch is seeking special admission. Filing fee $ 50, receipt number APAMDC-5417985.. (Rausch, Michael)
December 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 SCHEDULING ORDER: A Case Management conference will be conducted by the court on February 4, 2021 at 11:30 a.m. The court prefers to hold this conference by telephone. Plaintiffs counsel shall initiate this telephone conference. The telephone number of the court is 717-221-3990. Counsel should be prepared to address any pending motions at the conference. Counsel are advised to comply with Rule 16.3(a) of the Rules of Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania. Local Rule 16.3 requires lead counsel for each party to meet prior to the case management conference and complete a Joint Case Management Plan form. The completed form, which is set forth in Appendix A of the local rules, must be filed jointly by the parties on or before January 28, 2021. See Order for complete details. Signed by Honorable Yvette Kane on 12/23/20. (dmn)
December 23, 2020 Filing 6 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Norfolk Southern Railway Company.(Staudenmaier, Craig)
December 18, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Craig J. Staudenmaier on behalf of Norfolk Southern Railway Company. (Staudenmaier, Craig)
December 16, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jason Minich. Jason Minich served on 12/14/2020, answer due 1/4/2021. (Junk, Matthew)
December 15, 2020 Filing 3 Letter to Counsel re: Case Assignment and Procedures.Signed by Honorable Yvette Kane on 12/15/20. (dmn)
December 11, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Norfolk Southern Railway Company and provided TO ATTORNEY ELECTRONICALLY VIA ECF for service on Defendant(s)in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS RECEIVING THE SUMMONS ELECTRONICALLY: You must print the summons and the attachment when you receive it in your e-mail and serve them with the complaint on all defendants in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure). (Attachments: #1 Summons Packet) (aaa)
December 11, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Norfolk Southern Railway Company ( Filing fee $402, Receipt Number APAMDC-5384816), filed by Jason Minich. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(aaa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Minich v. Norfolk Southern Railway Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jason Minich
Represented By: Matthew J. Junk
Represented By: Michael Rausch
Represented By: John H. Coston, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Norfolk Southern Railway Company
Represented By: Craig J. Staudenmaier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?