Goff v. Cummins, Inc.
Plaintiff: Lorraine Goff
Defendant: Cummins, Inc. doing business as Cummins Sales and Service
Case Number: 1:2020cv02423
Filed: December 23, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Christopher C Conner
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1981
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 29, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Conference set for 3/4/2021 at 11:00 AM before Honorable Christopher C. Conner. Signed by Honorable Christopher C. Conner on 1/29/2021. (Attachments: #1 Term. Calendar)(mw)
January 21, 2021 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned by Lorraine Goff. (Summers, Sean)
January 21, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Claire McGee on behalf of Cummins, Inc. (McGee, Claire)
January 19, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Allison R. Brown on behalf of Cummins, Inc. (Brown, Allison)
January 14, 2021 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Lorraine Goff. Cummins, Inc. served on 1/11/2021, answer due 2/1/2021. (Summers, Sean)
December 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER re Case Assignment and Procedures. Signed by Honorable Christopher C. Conner on 12/28/2020. (mw)
December 23, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Cummins, Inc. and provided TO ATTORNEY ELECTRONICALLY VIA ECF for service on Defendant(s)in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS RECEIVING THE SUMMONS ELECTRONICALLY: You must print the summons and the attachment when you receive it in your e-mail and serve them with the complaint on all defendants in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure). (Attachments: #1 Summons Packet) (aaa)
December 23, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Cummins, Inc. ( Filing fee $402, Receipt Number APAMDC-5401505), filed by Lorraine Goff.(aaa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Goff v. Cummins, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lorraine Goff
Represented By: Sean E. Summers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cummins, Inc. doing business as Cummins Sales and Service
Represented By: Claire McGee
Represented By: Allison R. Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?