Barasky v. Shoemaker et al
Plaintiff: Anthony Barasky
Defendant: Chris Ebner, Ryan Barnes and Brad Shoemaker
Case Number: 1:2020cv02457
Filed: December 30, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: EB
Referring Judge: Sylvia H Rambo
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 3, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER Denying pltf's mtn for PI #11 . Signed by Honorable Sylvia H. Rambo on 2/16/21. (ma)
February 9, 2021 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Morgan M Madden on behalf of Ryan Barnes, Chris Ebner, Brad Shoemaker (Madden, Morgan)
February 9, 2021 Filing 17 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned by Brad Shoemaker. (Bluth, Brian)
February 9, 2021 Filing 16 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned by Chris Ebner. (Bluth, Brian)
February 9, 2021 Filing 15 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned by Ryan Barnes. (Bluth, Brian)
February 9, 2021 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Brian J. Bluth on behalf of Ryan Barnes, Chris Ebner, Brad Shoemaker (Bluth, Brian)
February 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER denying pltf's mtn to appoint cnsl #12 . Signed by Honorable Sylvia H. Rambo on 2/8/21. (ma)
February 8, 2021 Filing 12 MOTION to Appoint Counsel filed by Anthony Barasky.(pjr)
February 8, 2021 Filing 11 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Anthony Barasky.(pjr)
January 29, 2021 Filing 10 CERTIFIED Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement for Anthony Barasky. (sm)
January 22, 2021 Filing 9 Waiver of Service forms (AO 398 and 399) Mailed to All Defendants Waiver of Service due by 2/22/2021. (ma)
January 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER DIRECTING THE CLERK'S OFFICE TO SEND AO 398 AND 399 WAIVERS FORMS to defendants. Mtn for leave to proceed ifp #5 is granted. Pltf shall pay the full filing fee of $350.00 based on the financial information provided in the application to proceed ifp. The full filing fee shall be paid regardless of the outcome of the case. the Superintendent/Warden, or other appropriate official at Pltfs place of confinement is directed to deduct an initial partial filing fee of 20% of the greater of (see order). The Clerk of Court is directed to SEND a copy of this Order to the Superintendent/Warden of the institution wherein Pltf is presently confined. Signed by Honorable Sylvia H. Rambo on 1/22/21. (ma)
January 15, 2021 Filing 7 FIFTEEN (15) DAY ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER - Within 15 days of the date of this Order, the Warden or other appropriate official of the institution at which Plaintiff is currently incarcerated is directed to provide to the Court, under oath, or declare under penalty of perjury, a statement of the current balance in the Plaintiffs account and a record of the transactions in his account that have occurred with the preceding six (6) months. Order sent to Superintendent and plaintiff. Signed by LP on 01/15/2021. (lp)
January 15, 2021 Filing 6 AO 398 and AO 399 Waiver of Service Forms Completed by Plaintiff. (sm)
January 15, 2021 Filing 5 UNCERTIFIED MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Anthony Barasky.(sm) Modified on 1/15/2021 (lp).
January 5, 2021 Filing 4 THIRTY (30) DAY ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER directing the prisoner to pay the filing fee or file a signed Application to Proceed IFP within 30 days or case will be dismissed. Signed by LP on 01/05/2021. (Attachments: #1 IFP (civil rights))(lp)
January 5, 2021 Filing 3 PRO SE LETTER ISSUED w/ Notice & Consent Form. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Consent, #2 Instruction Sheet, #3 Fed and Local Rules, #4 398 Forms, #5 399 Form) (lp)
December 30, 2020 Filing 2 UNCERTIFIED Application to proceed in forma paueris. Handwritten form. (lp) Modified on 1/5/2021 (lp).
December 30, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants lodged pending the disposition of the Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, filed by Anthony Barasky.(lp) Modified on 1/5/2021 (lp).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Barasky v. Shoemaker et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chris Ebner
Represented By: Morgan M Madden
Represented By: Brian J. Bluth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ryan Barnes
Represented By: Morgan M Madden
Represented By: Brian J. Bluth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brad Shoemaker
Represented By: Morgan M Madden
Represented By: Brian J. Bluth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony Barasky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?