ALLEN v. WETZEL et al
Plaintiff: Nafis Allen
Defendant: Warden John Wetzel, Wellpath, Jorge Dominic and Kevin Ransom
Case Number: 1:2021cv00182
Filed: February 2, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: EB
Referring Judge: Sylvia H Rambo
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Civil Rights (Prison Conditions)
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 3, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 15, 2021 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Emily B. Ryan-Fiore on behalf of Jorge Dominic, Wellpath (Ryan-Fiore, Emily)
March 15, 2021 Filing 17 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned by Wellpath, Jorge Dominic. Wellpath waiver sent on 3/9/2021, answer due 5/10/2021; Jorge Dominic waiver sent on 3/9/2021, answer due 5/10/2021. (Goodrich, Caitlin)
March 15, 2021 Filing 16 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO FRCP 7.1 by Wellpath. (Goodrich, Caitlin)
March 15, 2021 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Caitlin J Goodrich on behalf of Jorge Dominic, Wellpath (Goodrich, Caitlin)
March 12, 2021 Filing 14 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned by Kevin Ransom, John Wetzel. (Dorian, Raymond)
March 12, 2021 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Raymond W. Dorian on behalf of Kevin Ransom, John Wetzel (Dorian, Raymond)
February 26, 2021 Filing 12 Waiver of Service forms (AO 398 and 399) Mailed to All Defendants Waiver of Service due by 3/29/2021. (ma)
February 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER DIRECTING THE CLERK'S OFFICE TO SEND AO 398 AND 399 WAIVERS FORMS to defendants. Granting pltf's Mtn for Leave to Proceed ifp #10 . Pltf shall pay the full filing fee of $350.00 based on the financial information provided in the application per this order. The Clerk of Court is directed to SEND a copy of this Order to the Superintendent/Warden of the institution wherein Pltf is presently confined. Signed by Honorable Sylvia H. Rambo on 2/26/21. (ma)
February 25, 2021 Filing 10 UNCERTIFIED MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Nafis Allen.(dw)
February 25, 2021 Filing 9 CERTIFIED Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Nafis Allen. (dw)
February 25, 2021 Filing 8 DECLARATION of Shekir Thomas filed by Nafis Allen. (dw)
February 2, 2021 Filing 7 PRO SE LETTER ISSUED w/ Notice & Consent Form. (Attachments: #1 Pro Se Prisoner Instructions for Filing a Complaint, #2 Excerpts of Local and Federal Rules, #3 AO398, #4 AO399) (lg)
February 2, 2021 Filing 6 (THIRTY (30) DAY ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER) directing the prisoner to pay the filing fee or file a signed Application to Proceed IFP within 30 days or case will be dismissed. (Attachment: #1 IFP Form) (lg)
February 2, 2021 Filing 5 Case transferred electronically in from Eastern District of Pennsylvania, Case Number 2:21-cv-00162, containing electronic documents. (lg)
February 2, 2021 Original record transferred to the Middle District of Pennsylvania via interdistrict transfer system. (md, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 2/2/2021.]
January 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDERED THAT THE CLERK OF COURT SHALL TRANSFER THIS CASE FORTHWITH TO THE U.S. DISTRICT COURT FOR THE MIDDLE DISTRICT OF PENNSYLVANIA, WHICH CAN CONSIDER MR. ALLENS MOTION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS. THE CLERK SHALL MARK THIS CASE CLOSED FOR STATISTICAL PURPOSES. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOSHUA D. WOLSON ON 1/29/21. 1/29/21 ENTERED AND COPIES NOT MAILED TO PLAINTIFF.(jaa, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 2/2/2021.]
January 11, 2021 Filing 3 PRO SE NOTICE RE:GUIDELINES (amas, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 2/2/2021.]
January 11, 2021 Filing 2 COMPLAINT (Lodged with Motion for iFP) against JORGE DOMINIC, KEVIN RANSOM, WELLPATH, JOHN WETZEL, filed by NAFIS ALLEN. IFP PENDING. (Attachments: #1 Designation Form)(amas, ) Modified on 1/13/2021 (md, ). [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 2/2/2021.] Modified on 2/2/2021 (to add lodged language) (lg).
January 11, 2021 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by NAFIS ALLEN.(amas, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 2/2/2021.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ALLEN v. WETZEL et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warden John Wetzel
Represented By: Raymond W. Dorian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wellpath
Represented By: Emily B. Ryan-Fiore
Represented By: Caitlin J Goodrich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jorge Dominic
Represented By: Emily B. Ryan-Fiore
Represented By: Caitlin J Goodrich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin Ransom
Represented By: Raymond W. Dorian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nafis Allen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?