Hitner v. Reese et al
Plaintiff: Clinton F Hitner
Defendant: John Doe (1), Corrections Lt. Newberry, John Doe (3), John Doe (2) and Corrections Captain Reese
Case Number: 1:2021cv00430
Filed: March 10, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: CA
Referring Judge: Christopher C Conner
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 26, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 26, 2021 Filing 16 Request for copy of docket sheet Received from Hitner (sm)
April 26, 2021 Filing 15 "third"MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Clinton F Hitner.(sm)
April 12, 2021 Filing 14 U.S. MARSHAL - 285, Service Forms Completed by Plaintiff. (sm)
April 9, 2021 Filing 13 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned by Corrections Lt. Newberry, Corrections Captain Reese. (Yarish, Mary Katherine)
April 9, 2021 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Mary Katherine M. Yarish on behalf of Corrections Lt. Newberry, Corrections Captain Reese (Yarish, Mary Katherine)
April 9, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Allison L. Deibert on behalf of Corrections Lt. Newberry, Corrections Captain Reese (Deibert, Allison)
March 31, 2021 Filing 10 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Clinton F Hitner.(sm)
March 11, 2021 Filing 9 Waiver of Service forms (AO 398 and 399) Mailed to Corrections Lt. Newberry, Corrections Captain Reese. WAIVERS NOT SENT TO JOHN DOES 1-3 DUE TO NO NAMES GIVEN. Waiver of Service due by 4/12/2021. (Attachments: #1 Mailing Labels)(mw)
March 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER DIRECTING THE CLERK'S OFFICE TO SEND AO 398 AND 399 WAIVERS FORMS to defendants and granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Honorable Christopher C. Conner on 3/11/2021. (mw)
March 10, 2021 Filing 7 PRO SE LETTER ISSUED w/ Notice & Consent Form. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Consent, #2 Instruction Sheet, #3 Fed and Local Rules) (lp)
March 10, 2021 Filing 6 AO 398 and AO 399 Waiver of Service Forms Completed by Plaintiff. (lp)
March 10, 2021 Filing 5 DECLARATIONS of Izel Garrett, Darrance Peters, Dan D. Hernandez, Basim Murdaugh, and John Berger filed by Clinton F Hitner. (lp)
March 10, 2021 Filing 4 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Clinton F Hitner.(lp)
March 10, 2021 Filing 3 CERTIFIED Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Clinton F Hitner. (lp)
March 10, 2021 Filing 2 CERTIFIED MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Clinton F Hitner.(lp)
March 10, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against John Doe (1), John Doe (2), John Doe (3), Corrections Lt. Newberry, Corrections Captain Reese lodged pending the disposition of the Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, filed by Clinton F Hitner.(lp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hitner v. Reese et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe (1)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Corrections Lt. Newberry
Represented By: Allison L. Deibert
Represented By: Mary Katherine M. Yarish
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe (3)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe (2)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Corrections Captain Reese
Represented By: Allison L. Deibert
Represented By: Mary Katherine M. Yarish
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Clinton F Hitner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?