Hershey v. The Pennsylvania Department of Transportation
Plaintiff: Todd Hershey
Defendant: The Pennsylvania Department of Transportation
Case Number: 1:2021cv00506
Filed: March 22, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Sylvia H Rambo
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 2611
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 29, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER - A Case Management Conference has been set for 6/3/2021 at 9:30 AM before Honorable Sylvia H. Rambo. This conference is by phone. A phone number and access number will be sent via e-mail prior to the conference. A joint case mgmnt plan is to be filed by 5/27/21. Signed by Honorable Sylvia H. Rambo on 4/29/21. (ma)
April 19, 2021 Filing 6 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by The Pennsylvania Department of Transportation.(Deibert, Allison)
April 13, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Allison L. Deibert on behalf of The Pennsylvania Department of Transportation (Deibert, Allison)
April 5, 2021 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Todd Hershey. The Pennsylvania Department of Transportation served on 3/29/2021, answer due 4/19/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A)(Ward, Joshua)
March 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER Re: Case Assignment and Procedures Signed by Honorable Sylvia H. Rambo on 3/30/21. (ma)
March 24, 2021 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to The Pennsylvania Department of Transportation and provided TO ATTORNEY ELECTRONICALLY VIA ECF for service on Defendant(s)in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS RECEIVING THE SUMMONS ELECTRONICALLY: You must print the summons and the attachment when you receive it in your e-mail and serve them with the complaint on all defendants in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure). (Attachments: #1 Summons Packet) (aaa)
March 22, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against The Pennsylvania Department of Transportation ( Filing fee $402, Receipt Number APAMDC-5518872), filed by Todd Hershey. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit(s))(aaa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hershey v. The Pennsylvania Department of Transportation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Todd Hershey
Represented By: Justin Bahorich
Represented By: Joshua P. Ward
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Pennsylvania Department of Transportation
Represented By: Allison L. Deibert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?