Lockwood v. Ryder Vehicle Sales, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Jamie Lockwood
Defendant: Ryder Transportation Services, Daimler Trucks North America, LLC, Ryder Truck Rental, Inc., Ryder Truck Rental, Detroit Diesel Corporation, Ryder Vehicle Sales, LLC, Ryder System, Inc. and ryder truck rental lt
Case Number: 1:2021cv00657
Filed: April 9, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Yvette Kane
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 28, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 28, 2021 DOCKET ANNOTATION: Petitioner and associate counsel BAR status verified. (ibr)
May 27, 2021 Filing 18 PETITION FOR SPECIAL ADMISSION (PRO HAC VICE) by Larry J Britton on behalf of Ryder Truck Rental, Inc., ryder truck rental lt Attorney Larry J. Britton is seeking special admission. Filing fee $ 50, receipt number APAMDC-5590025.. (Britton, Larry)
May 27, 2021 Filing 17 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned by Jamie Lockwood. Detroit Diesel Corporation waiver sent on 5/20/2021, answer due 7/19/2021. (Chapman, David)
May 26, 2021 Filing 16 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned by Jamie Lockwood. ryder truck rental lt waiver sent on 5/20/2021, answer due 7/19/2021. (Chapman, David)
May 26, 2021 Filing 15 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned by Jamie Lockwood. Ryder Truck Rental, Inc. waiver sent on 5/20/2021, answer due 7/19/2021. (Chapman, David)
May 26, 2021 Filing 14 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO FRCP 7.1 by Ryder Truck Rental, Inc.. (Godin, James)
May 26, 2021 Filing 13 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO FRCP 7.1 by ryder truck rental lt. (Godin, James)
May 26, 2021 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by James Godin on behalf of Ryder Truck Rental, Inc., ryder truck rental lt (Godin, James)
May 20, 2021 Filing 11 ANSWER to #9 Amended Complaint and Affirmative Defenses by Daimler Trucks North America, LLC.(Timmer, John)
May 17, 2021 Filing 10 Summons Issued as to Detroit Diesel Corporation, Ryder Truck Rental, Inc., ryder truck rental lt and provided TO ATTORNEY ELECTRONICALLY VIA ECF for service on Defendant(s)in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS RECEIVING THE SUMMONS ELECTRONICALLY: You must print the summons and the attachment when you receive it in your e-mail and serve the complaint on all defendants in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure). (Attachments: #1 Summons Packet) (aaa)
May 6, 2021 Filing 9 AMENDED COMPLAINT -FIRST against Daimler Trucks North America, LLC, Detroit Diesel Corporation, Ryder Truck Rental, Inc., ryder truck rental lt, filed by Jamie Lockwood.(Chapman, David)
May 3, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by John Timmer on behalf of Daimler Trucks North America, LLC (Timmer, John)
May 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #5 - AND NOW, this 3rd day of May, 2021, after review of Plaintiffs Motion for Leave to File First Amended Complaint, the Motion is hereby GRANTED, and Plaintiff is given leave to file her First Amended Complaint as attached to her motion. Signed by Honorable Yvette Kane on 5/3/21. (dmn)
April 30, 2021 Filing 6 BRIEF IN SUPPORT of Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File First Amended Complaint re #5 MOTION for Leave to File First Amended Complaint filed by Jamie Lockwood.(Chapman, David)
April 30, 2021 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to File First Amended Complaint by Jamie Lockwood. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A-redlined version of original complaint, #2 Exhibit(s) B-proposed first amended complaint, #3 Proposed Order, #4 Certificate of Concurrence)(Chapman, David)
April 13, 2021 Filing 4 Letter to Counsel re: Case Assignment and Procedures.Signed by Honorable Yvette Kane on 4/13/21. (dmn)
April 12, 2021 Filing 3 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Daimler Trucks North America, LLC. (Evans, James)
April 12, 2021 SPECIAL ADMISSION FORM for Jay Evans, Alice Johnston, John Timmer can be obtained at http://www.pamd.uscourts.gov/forms/petition-admission-practice. (pjr)
April 9, 2021 Filing 2 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO FRCP 7.1 filed by Daimler Trucks North America, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Daimler AG for Daimler Trucks North America, LLC. (pjr)
April 9, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Daimler Trucks North America, LLC from Dauphin County Court of Common Please, case number 2020CV1483CV. (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number APAMDC-5540942), filed by Daimler Trucks North America, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Civil Cover Sheet, #6 Cover sheet attachment, #7 Daimler Answer and Affirmative Defenses)(pjr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lockwood v. Ryder Vehicle Sales, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jamie Lockwood
Represented By: David Joseph Chapman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ryder Transportation Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daimler Trucks North America, LLC
Represented By: Jay Evans
Represented By: John R. Timmer
Represented By: Alice S Johnston
Represented By: James M. Evans
Represented By: John Timmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ryder Truck Rental, Inc.
Represented By: James Godin
Represented By: Larry J Britton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ryder Truck Rental
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Detroit Diesel Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ryder Vehicle Sales, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ryder System, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ryder truck rental lt
Represented By: James Godin
Represented By: Larry J Britton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?