Campfield v. Saul
Plaintiff: Nicolette Campfield
Defendant: Andrew Saul
Case Number: 1:2021cv00678
Filed: April 12, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Matthew W Brann
Referring Judge: Martin C Carlson
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 27, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 27, 2021 Filing 10 ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE - Attorney General served 4/26/21. (dw)
April 27, 2021 Filing 9 ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE - U.S. Attorney Scranton served 4/20/2021. (dw)
April 27, 2021 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed Social Security Administration served on 4/27/2021, answer due 6/28/2021. (dw)
April 27, 2021 VERBAL ORDER REASSIGNING CASE - Case reassigned to Honorable Matthew W. Brann and referred to Magistrate Judge Martin C. Carlson as one or more parties have not consented to the jurisdiction of a U.S. Magistrate Judge. (jkc)
April 23, 2021 Filing 7 CONSENT FORM SENT (For Direct Assignment Cases to Magistrate Judges) to Nicolette Campfield, Andrew Saul YOU MUST SAVE THIS FORM TO YOUR DESKTOP. THEN OPEN THE SAVED FORM AND COMPLETE THE REQUIRED SECTIONS. DO NOT FILE THIS FORM IN THE CLERKS OFFICE. THE FORM MUST BE E-MAILED TO consents@pamd.uscourts.gov OR IF YOU ARE NOT AN ECF REGISTERED USER, THEN MAIL THE FORM TO Clerks Administrative Assistant, Clerks Office, P.O. Box 1148, Scranton, PA 18501-1148. Consent Form due by 5/24/2021. (kjn)
April 22, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by George Michael Thiel on behalf of Andrew Saul. (Thiel, George)
April 13, 2021 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Andrew Saul and provided TO U.S. MARSHAL for service on Defendant(s)in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS RECEIVING THE SUMMONS ELECTRONICALLY: You must print the summons and the attachment when you receive it in your e-mail and serve them with the complaint on all defendants in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure). After you make service, you are further directed to file a Return of Service using the event Summons Returned Executed as to USA under the category Service of Process, in ECF. (kjn)
April 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER DIRECTING U.S. MARSHAL TO SERVE SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT / Order granting #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Nicolette Campfield. Signed by Magistrate Judge Martin C. Carlson on April 13, 2021. (kjn)
April 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 STANDING PRACTICE ORDER 13-9 in Social Security Appeals Signed by Magistrate Judge Martin C. Carlson on 04/13/21. (pjr)
April 12, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Nicolette Campfield.(pjr)
April 12, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Andrew Saul lodged pending the disposition of the Motion for In Forma Pauperis, filed by Nicolette Campfield. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(pjr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Campfield v. Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nicolette Campfield
Represented By: Christopher J. Marzzacco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Saul
Represented By: George Michael Thiel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?