Strike 3 Holdings, LLC v. John Doe subscriber assigned IP address 174.55.231.231
Plaintiff: Strike 3 Holdings, LLC
Defendant: John Doe subscriber assigned IP address 174.55.231.231
Case Number: 1:2021cv00709
Filed: April 16, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Sylvia H Rambo
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 10, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER Granting pltf's mtn for leave to file a third party subpoena #5 . See order for conditions. Signed by Honorable Sylvia H. Rambo on 6/10/21. (ma)
May 26, 2021 DOCKET ANNOTATION: Counsel is reminded to file the Brief in support of for Doc. 5 as a separate entry using the event: Civil Events Motions and Related Filings Responses and Replies (Briefs)- Brief in Support (Do not use for Summary Judgment Motions). DO NOT REFILE THE MOTION. (pjr)
May 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER Re: Case Assignment and Procedures Signed by Honorable Sylvia H. Rambo on 5/10/21. (ma)
May 7, 2021 DOCKET ANNOTATION: DOCKET ANNOTATION: Counsel is advised to file the Brief in support of for Doc. 5 as a separate entry using the event: Civil Events Motions and Related Filings Responses and Replies (Briefs)- Brief in Support (Do not use for Summary Judgment Motions). DO NOT REFILE THE MOTION. (pjr)
May 6, 2021 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to File Third Party Subpoena by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Memo, #3 Exhibit(s), #4 Appendix)(Saruya, Jason)
April 16, 2021 Filing 4 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO FRCP 7.1 by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC identifying Corporate Parent General Media Systems, LLC for Strike 3 Holdings, LLC. (Saruya, Jason)
April 16, 2021 Filing 3 Notice of filing sent to Register of Copyrights. (pjr)
April 16, 2021 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to John Doe subscriber assigned IP address 174.55.231.231 and provided TO ATTORNEY ELECTRONICALLY VIA ECF for service on Defendant(s)in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS RECEIVING THE SUMMONS ELECTRONICALLY: You must print the summons and the attachment when you receive it in your e-mail and serve the complaint on all defendants in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure). (Attachments: #1 Summons Packet) (pjr)
April 16, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against John Doe subscriber assigned IP address 174.55.231.231 ( Filing fee $402, Receipt Number APAMDC-5548322), filed by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s), #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(pjr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Strike 3 Holdings, LLC v. John Doe subscriber assigned IP address 174.55.231.231
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Strike 3 Holdings, LLC
Represented By: Jason M. Saruya
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe subscriber assigned IP address 174.55.231.231
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?