Colon et al v. United States of America et al
Plaintiff: Richard Gil and Susanna Colon
Defendant: Hamilton Health Center, Inc. and United States of America
Case Number: 1:2021cv00889
Filed: May 17, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Yvette Kane
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28:1346
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 9, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 9, 2021 Filing 11 REPLY BRIEF re #8 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Hamilton Health Center, Inc., United States of America.(Jani, Navin)
July 6, 2021 Filing 10 BRIEF IN OPPOSITION re #8 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Susanna Colon, Richard Gil. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Certificate of Service, #3 Memo)(Wilson, Rhonda)
June 22, 2021 Filing 9 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #8 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Hamilton Health Center, Inc., United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Declaration)(Jani, Navin)
June 22, 2021 Filing 8 MOTION to Dismiss by Hamilton Health Center, Inc., United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Nonconcurrence, #2 Proposed Order)(Jani, Navin)
June 21, 2021 Filing 7 BRIEF IN OPPOSITION re #4 MOTION for Extension of Time to Leave to File Late Notice of FTCA Claim filed by Hamilton Health Center, Inc., United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Declaration)(Jani, Navin)
June 10, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Navin Jani on behalf of Hamilton Health Center, Inc., United States of America. (Jani, Navin)
June 8, 2021 Filing 5 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #4 MOTION for Extension of Time to Leave to File Late Notice of FTCA Claim filed by Susanna Colon, Richard Gil.(Wilson, Rhonda)
June 8, 2021 DOCKET ANNOTATION: Counsel is advised to file the brief in support of Doc. 4 as a separate entry using the event: Civil Events Motions and Related Filings Responses and Replies (Briefs)- Brief in Support (Do not use for Summary Judgment Motions). (pjr)
June 7, 2021 Filing 4 MOTION for Extension of Time to Leave to File Late Notice of FTCA Claim by Susanna Colon, Richard Gil. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Order, #2 Notice of Motion, #3 Memo, #4 Exhibit(s), #5 Exhibit(s), #6 Exhibit(s), #7 Certificate of Service)(Wilson, Rhonda)
May 26, 2021 Filing 3 Letter to Counsel re: Case Assignment and Procedures. Signed by Honorable Yvette Kane on 5/26/21. (dmn)
May 21, 2021 Receipt of payment from SUSANNA COLON in the amount of $402.00 for CIVIL FILING FEE- NON-PRISONER. Transaction posted on 5/20/2021. Receipt number 111027110 processed by aarlidge. (jjs)
May 17, 2021 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Hamilton Health Center, Inc., United States of America and provided TO ATTORNEY ELECTRONICALLY VIA ECF for service on Defendant(s)in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS RECEIVING THE SUMMONS ELECTRONICALLY: You must print the summons and the attachment when you receive it in your e-mail and serve the complaint on all defendants in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure). (Attachments: #1 Summons Packet) (pjr)
May 17, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Hamilton Health Center, Inc., United States of America, filed by Susanna Colon, Richard Gil. Filing fee received in Harrisburg, processing will occur on Thursday. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(pjr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Colon et al v. United States of America et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hamilton Health Center, Inc.
Represented By: Navin Jani
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Represented By: Navin Jani
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Gil
Represented By: Rhonda Hill Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Susanna Colon
Represented By: Rhonda Hill Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?