Goodermuth v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Frances Goodermuth
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security and Kilolo Kijakazi
Case Number: 1:2021cv01017
Filed: June 9, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Susan E Schwab
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 23, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 23, 2021 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon. Commissioner of Social Security served on 7/22/2021, answer due 9/20/2021. (sm)
July 21, 2021 Filing 10 CONSENTS to Proceed Before US Magistrate Judge Schwab in Direct Assignment Cases pursuant to Standing Order 2021-08. (jkc)
July 21, 2021 Filing 9 CONSENT FORM SENT (For Direct Assignment Cases to Magistrate Judges) to Commissioner of Social Security, Frances Goodermuth YOU MUST SAVE THIS FORM TO YOUR DESKTOP. THEN OPEN THE SAVED FORM AND COMPLETE THE REQUIRED SECTIONS. DO NOT FILE THIS FORM IN THE CLERKS OFFICE. THE FORM MUST BE E-MAILED TO consents@pamd.uscourts.gov OR IF YOU ARE NOT AN ECF REGISTERED USER, THEN MAIL THE FORM TO Clerks Administrative Assistant, Clerks Office, P.O. Box 1148, Scranton, PA 18501-1148. Consent Form due by 8/20/2021 (ki)
July 21, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Bryan Craig Black on behalf of Commissioner of Social Security. (Black, Bryan)
July 20, 2021 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Frances Goodermuth., upon AUSA served on 7/20/2021, answer due 9/20/2021. (sm)
June 24, 2021 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Commissioner of Social Security and provided TO U.S. MARSHAL for service on Defendant(s)in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS RECEIVING THE SUMMONS ELECTRONICALLY: You must print the summons and the attachment when you receive it in your e-mail and serve them with the complaint on all defendants in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure). After you make service, you are further directed to file a Return of Service using the event Summons Returned Executed as to USA under the category Service of Process, in ECF. (kjn)
June 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER - IT IS ORDERED that the plaintiffs application (doc. #2 ) to proceed informa pauperis is GRANTED. The complaint is now deemed filed. The Clerk ofCourt is directed to issue process to the United States Marshal who is directed to serve plaintiffs complaint in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4(i) within 14 days. The defendant shall serve and file an answer, together with a certified copy of the transcript of the administrative record, within 60 days of service of the complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan E. Schwab on June 24, 2021. (kjn)
June 9, 2021 Filing 4 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO FRCP 7.1 by Frances Goodermuth. (Merritt, Hannalore)
June 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 STANDING PRACTICE ORDER 13-9 in Social Security Appeals. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan E. Schwab on 06/09/21. (pjr)
June 9, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Frances Goodermuth.(pjr)
June 9, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security lodged pending the disposition of the Motion for In Forma Pauperis, filed by Frances Goodermuth. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(pjr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Goodermuth v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frances Goodermuth
Represented By: Hannalore B. Merritt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Bryan Craig Black
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kilolo Kijakazi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?