Allie v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Donna L. Allie
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security and Andrew Saul
Case Number: 1:2021cv01114
Filed: June 23, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Susan E Schwab
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 23, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 23, 2021 Filing 11 ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE upon U.S. Attorney General on 7/22/21. (dw)
July 23, 2021 Filing 10 ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE upon Social Security Administration on 7/22/21. (dw)
July 20, 2021 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed. US Attorney Scranton served on 7/20/2021, answer due 9/20/2021. (dw)
July 20, 2021 Filing 8 CONSENT FORM SENT (For Direct Assignment Cases to Magistrate Judges) to Donna L. Allie, Andrew Saul YOU MUST SAVE THIS FORM TO YOUR DESKTOP. THEN OPEN THE SAVED FORM AND COMPLETE THE REQUIRED SECTIONS. DO NOT FILE THIS FORM IN THE CLERKS OFFICE. THE FORM MUST BE E-MAILED TO consents@pamd.uscourts.gov OR IF YOU ARE NOT AN ECF REGISTERED USER, THEN MAIL THE FORM TO Clerks Administrative Assistant, Clerks Office, P.O. Box 1148, Scranton, PA 18501-1148. Consent Form due by 8/19/2021 (ki)
July 20, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by George Michael Thiel on behalf of Andrew Saul. (Thiel, George)
June 25, 2021 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Andrew Saul and provided TO U.S. MARSHAL for service on Defendant(s)in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS RECEIVING THE SUMMONS ELECTRONICALLY: You must print the summons and the attachment when you receive it in your e-mail and serve them with the complaint on all defendants in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure). After you make service, you are further directed to file a Return of Service using the event Summons Returned Executed as to USA under the category Service of Process, in ECF. (ki)
June 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting pltf's app #2 to proceed IFP, deeming complaint filed, directing Clrk of Ct to issue process to the USM who is directed to serve pltf's complaint in acc w/ FRCP 4(i) w/in 14 days & directing deft to serve & file an answer w/ copy of admin record transcript w/in 60 days of service of the complaint. (See order for complete detail.) Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan E. Schwab on 6/25/21. (ki)
June 23, 2021 Filing 4 STANDING PRACTICE ORDER 13-9 in Social Security Appeals. (aaa)
June 23, 2021 Filing 3 Letter to Court from Attorney requesting summons. (aaa)
June 23, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Donna L. Allie.(aaa)
June 23, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security lodged pending the disposition of the Motion for In Forma Pauperis, filed by Donna L. Allie. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(aaa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Allie v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donna L. Allie
Represented By: Jamie Ryan Hall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Saul
Represented By: George Michael Thiel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?