Chipoco v. Social Security Administration
Plaintiff: Guillermo R. Chipoco
Defendant: Social Security Adminstration and Social Security Administration
Case Number: 1:2021cv01154
Filed: June 29, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Martin C Carlson
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 205
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 27, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 27, 2021 Filing 11 CONSENTS to Proceed Before US Magistrate Judge Carlson in Direct Assignment Cases pursuant to Standing Order 2021-08. (jkc)
July 28, 2021 Filing 10 CONSENT FORM SENT (For Direct Assignment Cases to Magistrate Judges) to Guillermo R. Chipoco, Social Security Administration YOU MUST SAVE THIS FORM TO YOUR DESKTOP. THEN OPEN THE SAVED FORM AND COMPLETE THE REQUIRED SECTIONS. DO NOT FILE THIS FORM IN THE CLERKS OFFICE. THE FORM MUST BE E-MAILED TO consents@pamd.uscourts.gov OR IF YOU ARE NOT AN ECF REGISTERED USER, THEN MAIL THE FORM TO Clerks Administrative Assistant, Clerks Office, P.O. Box 1148, Scranton, PA 18501-1148. Consent Form due by 8/27/2021. (kjn)
July 23, 2021 Filing 9 ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE upon U.S. Attorney General on 7/22/21. (dw)
July 23, 2021 Filing 8 ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE upon Social Security Administration on 7/22/21. (dw)
July 21, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Melissa Swauger on behalf of Social Security Administration. (Swauger, Melissa)
July 21, 2021 DOCKET ANNOTATION: Summons Returned Executed [Doc 6] was mailed to plaintiff at the address on the docket on 7/21/2021. (ibr)
July 20, 2021 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed. U.S. Attorney Scranton served on 7/20/2021, answer due 9/20/2021. (dw)
July 1, 2021 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Social Security Administration and provided TO U.S. MARSHAL for service on Defendant(s)in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS RECEIVING THE SUMMONS ELECTRONICALLY: You must print the summons and the attachment when you receive it in your e-mail and serve them with the complaint on all defendants in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure). After you make service, you are further directed to file a Return of Service using the event Summons Returned Executed as to USA under the category Service of Process, in ECF. (kjn)
July 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER DIRECTING U.S. MARSHAL TO SERVE SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT / ORDER granting #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Guillermo R. Chipoco. Signed by Magistrate Judge Martin C. Carlson on July 1, 2021. (kjn)
June 29, 2021 Filing 3 STANDING PRACTICE ORDER 13-9 in Social Security Appeals. (ibr)
June 29, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Guillermo R. Chipoco.(ibr)
June 29, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Social Security Administration pending the disposition of the Motion for In Forma Pauperis, filed by Guillermo R. Chipoco. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(ibr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Chipoco v. Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Security Adminstration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Security Administration
Represented By: Melissa Swauger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Guillermo R. Chipoco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?