Rivera v. Kijakazi
Plaintiff: Karim Rosario Rivera
Defendant: Kilolo Kijakazi
Case Number: 1:2021cv01269
Filed: July 19, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Susan E Schwab
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 206
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 16, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 16, 2021 Filing 7 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint for 60 days, up to and including November 19, 2021 by Kilolo Kijakazi. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jebby Rasputnis September 13, 2021, #2 Certificate of Concurrence, #3 Proposed Order)(Black, Bryan)
August 2, 2021 Filing 6 CONSENTS to Proceed Before US Magistrate Judge Schwab in Direct Assignment Cases pursuant to Standing Order 2021-08. (jkc)
July 26, 2021 Filing 5 CONSENT FORM SENT (For Direct Assignment Cases to Magistrate Judges) to Kilolo Kijakazi, Karim Rosario Rivera YOU MUST SAVE THIS FORM TO YOUR DESKTOP. THEN OPEN THE SAVED FORM AND COMPLETE THE REQUIRED SECTIONS. DO NOT FILE THIS FORM IN THE CLERKS OFFICE. THE FORM MUST BE E-MAILED TO consents@pamd.uscourts.gov OR IF YOU ARE NOT AN ECF REGISTERED USER, THEN MAIL THE FORM TO Clerks Administrative Assistant, Clerks Office, P.O. Box 1148, Scranton, PA 18501-1148. Consent Form due by 8/25/2021 (ki)
July 22, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Bryan Craig Black on behalf of Kilolo Kijakazi. (Black, Bryan)
July 20, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Kilolo Kijakazi and provided TO ATTORNEY ELECTRONICALLY VIA ECF for service on Defendant(s)in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS RECEIVING THE SUMMONS ELECTRONICALLY: You must print the summons and the attachment when you receive it in your e-mail and serve them with the complaint on all defendants in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure). After you make service, you are further directed to file a Return of Service using the event Summons Returned Executed as to USA under the category Service of Process, in ECF. (pjr)
July 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 STANDING PRACTICE ORDER 13-9 in Social Security Appeals. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan E. Schwab on 07/20/21. (pjr)
July 19, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Kilolo Kijakazi ( Filing fee $402, Receipt Number APAMDC-5640250), filed by Karim Rosario Rivera. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(pjr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rivera v. Kijakazi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karim Rosario Rivera
Represented By: Jason J. Schibinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kilolo Kijakazi
Represented By: Bryan Craig Black
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?