Reitzi v. Vans Express Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Patricia Reitzi
Defendant: Vans Express Inc. and DHL Express (USA) Inc. doing business as DHL Express
Case Number: 1:2021cv01514
Filed: September 2, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Christopher C Conner
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 25, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER granting #27 Stipulation filed by Patricia Reitzi. Signed by Honorable Christopher C. Conner on 10/25/2021. (mw)
October 25, 2021 Filing 27 STIPULATION AND PROPOSED ORDER TO STAY CASE PENDING ALTERNATIVE DISPUTE RESOLUTION AND TOLLING by Patricia Reitzi. (Fundora Rodriguez, Camille)
October 20, 2021 Filing 26 VERBAL ORDER It is ORDERED that the stipulation #25 of the parties is construed as a joint motion to extend the answer deadline and is GRANTED as so construed. Defendant Van Express Inc., shall have until October 26, 2021, in which to answer, move or otherwise respond to the complaint. Signed by Honorable Christopher C. Conner on 10/20/2021. (Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the order of the court or notice on the matter.) (mw)
October 20, 2021 Filing 25 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by Vans Express Inc..(Ensign, Cathryn)
October 13, 2021 Filing 24 VERBAL ORDER - It is hereby ordered that the motion #23 to Continue the Case Management Conference is GRANTED - the case management conference is CONTINUED to 12/9/2021 at 10:00 a.m. All other dates and deadlines in the original scheduling order #20 are unchanged. (Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the order of the court or notice on the matter.) Signed by the Honorable Christopher C. Conner on 10/13/2021. (mw)
October 12, 2021 Filing 23 MOTION to Continue DHL's Unopposed Motion for Continuance of the Case Management Conference by DHL Express (USA) Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Schoonmaker, Linda)
September 29, 2021 Filing 22 VERBAL ORDER It is ORDERED that the motion #21 is GRANTED and defendant Van Express, Inc., shall have until October 19, 2021, to answer or otherwise respond to the complaint. Signed by Honorable Christopher C. Conner on 9/29/2021. (Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the order of the court or notice on the matter.) (mw)
September 28, 2021 Filing 21 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by Vans Express Inc..(Ensign, Cathryn)
September 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Conference set for 11/4/2021 at 02:00 PM before Honorable Christopher C. Conner. Signed by Honorable Christopher C. Conner on 9/28/2021. (Attachments: #1 Term. Calendar)(mw)
September 22, 2021 Filing 19 SPECIAL ADMISSIONS FORM APPROVED as to Cathryn Ensign. Signed by Honorable Christopher C. Conner on 9/22/2021. (mw)
September 22, 2021 Filing 18 SPECIAL ADMISSIONS FORM APPROVED as to Keith Pryatel. Signed by Honorable Christopher C. Conner on 9/22/2021. (mw)
September 22, 2021 Filing 17 NOTICE by Vans Express Inc. re #15 Petition for Special Admission - Pro Hac Vice (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Exhibit A - Code of Professional Conduct)(Ensign, Cathryn)
September 22, 2021 Filing 16 NOTICE by Vans Express Inc. re #14 Petition for Special Admission - Pro Hac Vice (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Exhibit A - Code of Professional Conduct)(Ensign, Cathryn)
September 22, 2021 DOCKET ANNOTATION: Counsel is advised to file Supplements to Docs 14 & 15. Code of Conduct form needs to be signed and filed. (aaa)
September 21, 2021 Filing 15 PETITION FOR SPECIAL ADMISSION (PRO HAC VICE) by Cathryn Rae Ensign on behalf of Vans Express Inc. Attorney Keith L. Pryatel is seeking special admission. Filing fee $ 50, receipt number APAMDC-5702399.. (Ensign, Cathryn)
September 21, 2021 Filing 14 PETITION FOR SPECIAL ADMISSION (PRO HAC VICE) by Cathryn Rae Ensign on behalf of Vans Express Inc. Attorney Cathryn R. Ensign is seeking special admission. Filing fee $ 50, receipt number APAMDC-5702383.. (Ensign, Cathryn)
September 17, 2021 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Jacob FM Oslick on behalf of DHL Express (USA) Inc. (Oslick, Jacob)
September 15, 2021 Filing 12 SPECIAL ADMISSIONS FORM APPROVED as to Brian Wadsworth. Signed by Honorable Christopher C. Conner on 9/15/2021. (mw)
September 15, 2021 Filing 11 SPECIAL ADMISSIONS FORM APPROVED as to Linda Schoonmaker. Signed by Honorable Christopher C. Conner on 9/15/2021. (mw)
September 15, 2021 Filing 10 PETITION FOR SPECIAL ADMISSION (PRO HAC VICE) by Brian A. Wadsworth on behalf of DHL Express (USA) Inc. Attorney Brian A. Wadsworth is seeking special admission. Filing fee $ 50, receipt number APAMDC-5696745.. (Wadsworth, Brian)
September 15, 2021 Filing 9 PETITION FOR SPECIAL ADMISSION (PRO HAC VICE) by Linda Cooper Schoonmaker on behalf of DHL Express (USA) Inc. Attorney Linda C. Schoonmaker is seeking special admission. Filing fee $ 50, receipt number APAMDC-5696684.. (Schoonmaker, Linda)
September 14, 2021 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned by Patricia Reitzi. DHL Express (USA) Inc. waiver sent on 9/13/2021, answer due 11/12/2021. (Fundora Rodriguez, Camille)
September 2, 2021 Filing 7 SPECIAL ADMISSIONS FORM APPROVED as to Reginald Lamar Streater. Signed by Honorable Christopher C. Conner on 9/2/2021. (mw)
September 2, 2021 Filing 6 SPECIAL ADMISSIONS FORM APPROVED as to Camille Fundora Rodriguez. Signed by Honorable Christopher C. Conner on 9/2/2021. (mw)
September 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER re Case Assignment and Procedures. Signed by Honorable Christopher C. Conner on 9/2/2021. (mw)
September 2, 2021 Filing 4 PETITION FOR SPECIAL ADMISSION (PRO HAC VICE) by Alexandra Koropey Piazza on behalf of Patricia Reitzi Attorney Reginald L. Streater is seeking special admission. Filing fee $ 50, receipt number APAMDC-5685901.. (Piazza, Alexandra)
September 2, 2021 Filing 3 PETITION FOR SPECIAL ADMISSION (PRO HAC VICE) by Alexandra Koropey Piazza on behalf of Patricia Reitzi Attorney Camille Fundora Rodriguez is seeking special admission. Filing fee $ 50, receipt number APAMDC-5685784.. (Piazza, Alexandra)
September 2, 2021 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to DHL Express (USA) Inc. and provided TO ATTORNEY ELECTRONICALLY VIA ECF for service on Defendant(s)in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS RECEIVING THE SUMMONS ELECTRONICALLY: You must print the summons and the attachment when you receive it in your e-mail and serve the complaint on all defendants in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure). (Attachments: #1 Summons Packet) (pjr)
September 2, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against DHL Express (USA) Inc., Vans Express Inc. ( Filing fee $402, Receipt Number APAMDC-5685449), filed by Patricia Reitzi. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(pjr)
September 2, 2021 SPECIAL ADMISSION FORM for Camille Rodriguez and Reginald Streater can be obtained at http://www.pamd.uscourts.gov/forms/petition-admission-practice. Information sent via email. (pjr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Reitzi v. Vans Express Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patricia Reitzi
Represented By: Alexandra Koropey Piazza
Represented By: Camille Fundora Rodriguez
Represented By: Reginald Streater
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vans Express Inc.
Represented By: Keith L. Pryatel
Represented By: Cathryn Rae Ensign
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DHL Express (USA) Inc. doing business as DHL Express
Represented By: Brian A. Wadsworth
Represented By: Jacob FM Oslick
Represented By: Linda Cooper Schoonmaker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?