Hanover Prest-Paving Co. v. Staten Island Building Products Dist Inc.
Plaintiff: Hanover Prest-Paving Co.
Defendant: Staten Island Building Products Dist Inc.
Case Number: 1:2021cv01672
Filed: September 28, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Christopher C Conner
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1126
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 23, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 23, 2021 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned by Hanover Prest-Paving Co.. Staten Island Building Products Dist Inc. waiver sent on 10/21/2021, answer due 12/20/2021. (Cook, Lindsey)
November 12, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Linda B. Alle-Murphy on behalf of Staten Island Building Products Dist Inc. (Alle-Murphy, Linda)
September 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER re Case Assignment and Procedures. Signed by Honorable Christopher C. Conner on 9/29/2021. (mw)
September 28, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Staten Island Building Products Dist Inc. and provided TO ATTORNEY ELECTRONICALLY VIA ECF for service on Defendant(s)in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS RECEIVING THE SUMMONS ELECTRONICALLY: You must print the summons and the attachment when you receive it in your e-mail and serve the complaint on all defendants in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure). (Attachments: #1 Summons Packet) (rw)
September 28, 2021 Filing 2 REPORT to Commissioner of filing or determination of an action PATENT. (rw)
September 28, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Staten Island Building Products Dist Inc. ( Filing fee $402, Receipt Number APAMDC-5709754), filed by Hanover Prest-Paving Co. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B)(rw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hanover Prest-Paving Co. v. Staten Island Building Products Dist Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hanover Prest-Paving Co.
Represented By: Justin A. Tomevi
Represented By: Lindsey M. Cook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Staten Island Building Products Dist Inc.
Represented By: Linda B. Alle-Murphy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?