State Farm Fire & Casualty Company v. Stevens et al
Plaintiff: State Farm Fire & Casualty Company
Defendant: Ashley Stevens, Evan Stevens, Grady Stevens, E.S. and G.S.
Case Number: 1:2021cv01673
Filed: September 28, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Christopher C Conner
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1391
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 18, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER - it is hereby ORDERED that defendants motion (Doc. #7 ) is DENIED as moot and without prejudice. Defendants shall respond to the second amended complaint (Doc. 15) in accordance with the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Signed by Honorable Christopher C. Conner on 11/18/2021 (mw)
November 18, 2021 Filing 15 SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by State Farm Fire & Casualty Company.(mw)
November 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER - it is hereby ORDERED that plaintiffs response (Doc. #12 ) is CONSTRUED as a motion for leave to amend and is GRANTED as so construed. The Clerk of Court shall promptly file the second amended complaint (Doc. 12-2) as a separate docket entry. Signed by Honorable Christopher C. Conner on 11/18/2021. (mw)
November 18, 2021 Filing 13 REPLY BRIEF re #7 MOTION to Dismiss Under Rule 129b)(6) and Motion to Strike under Rule 12(c) of defs filed by E.S., G.S., Ashley Stevens.(Cavalier, Robert)
November 15, 2021 Filing 12 BRIEF IN OPPOSITION re #7 MOTION to Dismiss Under Rule 129b)(6) and Motion to Strike under Rule 12(c) of defs filed by State Farm Fire & Casualty Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit(s))(de Luca, Daniel)
November 9, 2021 Filing 11 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO FRCP 7.1 by Ashley Stevens. (Cavalier, Robert)
November 9, 2021 Filing 10 DISCLOSURE REPORT. (Cavalier, Robert)
November 3, 2021 Filing 9 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #7 MOTION to Dismiss Under Rule 129b)(6) and Motion to Strike under Rule 12(c) of defs filed by E.S., G.S., Ashley Stevens. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Order, #2 Exhibit(s) A)(Cavalier, Robert)
November 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Conference set for 12/9/2021 at 01:30 PM before Honorable Christopher C. Conner. At least five days before the conference,counsel shall file their joint case management plan with the court. Signed by Honorable Christopher C. Conner on 11/1/2021. (Attachments: #1 Term. Calendar)(mw)
November 1, 2021 DOCKET ANNOTATION: Counsel is advised to refile the brief in support of Doc. 7 as a separate entry using the event: Civil Events Motions and Related Filings Responses and Replies (Briefs)- Brief in Support (Do not use for Summary Judgment Motions). Counsel is further advised to refile the proposed order as a separate document. Counsel is further advised to refile the attachments in Exhibit A in Portrait (vertical) mode. (pjr)
October 30, 2021 Filing 7 MOTION to Dismiss Under Rule 129b)(6) and Motion to Strike under Rule 12(c) of defs by E.S., G.S., Ashley Stevens.(Cavalier, Robert)
October 26, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert M. Cavalier on behalf of G.S., Ashley Stevens (Cavalier, Robert)
September 29, 2021 Filing 5 AMENDED COMPLAINT against E.S., G.S., Ashley Stevens, filed by State Farm Fire & Casualty Company.(de Luca, Daniel)
September 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER - it is hereby ORDERED that the Clerk of Court shall protectively seal the complaint. Plaintiff shall refile its complaint forthwith identifying the minor defendants by their initials only. Plaintiff is admonished that all future filings shall refer to minor defendants by their initials only. Signed by Honorable Christopher C. Conner on 9/29/2021. (mw)
September 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER re Case Assignment and Procedures. Signed by Honorable Christopher C. Conner on 9/29/2021. (mw)
September 28, 2021 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to All Defendants and provided TO ATTORNEY ELECTRONICALLY VIA ECF for service on Defendant(s)in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS RECEIVING THE SUMMONS ELECTRONICALLY: You must print the summons and the attachment when you receive it in your e-mail and serve the complaint on all defendants in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure). (Attachments: #1 Summons Packet) (aaa)
September 28, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $402, Receipt Number APAMDC-5709861), filed by State Farm Fire & Casualty Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(aaa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: State Farm Fire & Casualty Company v. Stevens et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State Farm Fire & Casualty Company
Represented By: Daniel J. de Luca
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ashley Stevens
Represented By: Robert M. Cavalier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Evan Stevens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Grady Stevens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: E.S.
Represented By: Robert M. Cavalier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: G.S.
Represented By: Robert M. Cavalier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?