Heilner, Jr. et al v. Advanced Thermal Hydronics, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Earl K. Heilner, Jr. and Kathryn Heilner
Defendant: Bayer Cropscience, Inc., CBS Corporation, A Delaware Corporation, Dyntherm Boiler Manufacturing, Easco Boiler Corp., Flexible Technologies, Inc., Goodrich Corporation, Goulds Pumps, LLC, John Crane, Inc., Linde, LLC, Lockheed Martin Corporation, Morgan Engineering, Reunion Industries, Inc., Schneider Electric USA, Inc., Reed Financial Inc., Individually and as Successor to The Hydrotherm Corporation, Cogency Global, Inc., American Premier Underwriters, Air & Liquid Systems Corporation, Aurora Pump Company, Automation Industries, Inc., Amchem Products, Inc., Burnham Corp., Carrier Corporation, CBS Corporation, a Pennsylvania Corporation, Westinghouse Electric Corp., Bethlehem Dynatherm, Federal Boilers, Automation Industries, Individually and as Successor to Hydrotherm, Inc., Foster Wheeler LLC, Survivor to a merger with Foster Wheeler Corp., General Electric Company, The B.F. Goodrich Co., The Goodyear Tire & Rubber Co., Goulds Pumps Inc., Greene, Tweed & Co, Inc., GTE Operations Support, Inc., Successor in Interest to GTE Products of Connecticut Corporation, Hajoca Corp., H.B. Fuller Company, H.B. Smith Company, Inc., a Division of Mestek, Inc., Hobart Brothers Company, Honeywell, Inc., Honeywell International, Inc., Successor to Allied-Signal, Inc., Successor to Bendix Corporation, IMO Industries, Inc., Individually and as Parent Company of and/or Successor to DeLaval Pump & Steam Turbine Co., Carborundum Company, J.H. France Refractories Company, Crane Packing Co., The John Wood Company, LLC, Keeler/Dorr-Oliver Boiler Company, Inc., Kerite LLC, The Lincoln Electric Company, The BCC Group, Inc., Martin Marietta Corporation, Martin Marietta Materials, Inc., MCIC, Mestek, Inc., Metropolitan Life Insurance Company, Inc., Mobil Corporation, Morgan Crane, The Okonite Company, Pecora Corporation, Pfizer, Inc., Poillock Research & Design, Inc., Reed Finanncial Corp., Alliance Machines, Rockwell Automation, Inc., RSCC Wire & Cable, LLC, Square D Company, Sid Harvey Industries, Inc., Superior Boiler Works, Inc., Terex Corporation, Union Carbide Corporation, Universal Refractories, a Division of Thiem Corporation, ECR International Inc., Individually and as Sessor-in-Interest to Utica Boilers, Viking Pump, Inc., Warren Pumps, LLC, Weil-McLain, Zurn Industries, LLC and Pollock Research & Design, Inc.
Cross Defendant: Advanced Thermal Hydronics, LLC, Burham, LLC, Industrical Holdings Corporation, McCormick Asbestos Company, Marley-Wylain Company, LLC, A.O. Smith Corporation, Brand Insulations, Inc., Cleaver Brooks, Inc., Columbus McKinnon Corporation, Compudyne, LLC, Cooper Industries, LLC, Corning Inc., on behalf of its former Corhart Refractories Business Division, Crane Company, DAP Products, Eaton Corporation, as Sussor-in-Interest to Cutler-Hammer, Inc., FMC Corporation, Individually and as successor in interest to Sterns Electric Corporation and Link-Belt Co./Construction Equipment Group, Foseco, Inc. and Pollock Research & Deisgn, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2022cv00616
Filed: April 28, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Jennifer P Wilson
Nature of Suit: P.I. : Asbestos
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1446 Petition for Removal- Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 2, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 24, 2022 Filing 140 A.O. Smith Corporation's ANSWER to Complaint ,Affirmative Defenses, Jury Demand, CROSSCLAIM and Answer to Cross-Claims against All Parties by A.O. Smith Corporation.(Kadish, Eric)
June 17, 2022 Filing 139 RESPONSE by Kathryn Heilner to #100 Order to Show Cause, . (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Duncan, Jason)
June 16, 2022 Filing 138 MOTION for Joinder IN CO-DEFENDANTS JOHN CRANE, INC. AND FLEXIBLE TECHNOLOGIES, INC.S MOTIONS TO DISMISS COUNTS IV & V OF PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO FED. R. CIV. P. 12(B)(6) by J.H. France Refractories Company.(Hagan, Tracey)
June 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 137 ORDER granting #134 Motion for Extension of Time to File. Signed by Honorable Jennifer P. Wilson on 6/16/2022 (ve)
June 16, 2022 Filing 136 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO FRCP 7.1 by Honeywell International, Inc., Successor to Allied-Signal, Inc., Successor to Bendix Corporation. (Neeson, Peter)
June 16, 2022 Filing 135 ANSWER to Complaint , CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by Honeywell International, Inc., Successor to Allied-Signal, Inc., Successor to Bendix Corporation.(Neeson, Peter)
June 15, 2022 Filing 134 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to Rule to Show Cause by Kathryn Heilner. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Duncan, Jason)
June 13, 2022 Filing 133 SPECIAL ADMISSIONS FORM APPROVED as to Peter J. Neeson, Esq. Signed by Honorable Jennifer P. Wilson on 6/13/2022. (ve)
June 13, 2022 ADMISSION FORMS SENT to Attorney David Singley. (lg)
June 10, 2022 Filing 132 NOTICE of Appearance by David J. Singley on behalf of Mobil Corporation (Singley, David)
June 10, 2022 Filing 131 PETITION FOR SPECIAL ADMISSION (PRO HAC VICE) by Peter J Neeson on behalf of Honeywell International, Inc., Successor to Allied-Signal, Inc., Successor to Bendix Corporation Attorney Peter Neeson is seeking special admission. Filing fee $ 50, receipt number APAMDC-5971303.. (Neeson, Peter)
June 9, 2022 Filing 130 NOTICE of Appearance by Scott F. Griffith on behalf of Honeywell International, Inc., Successor to Allied-Signal, Inc., Successor to Bendix Corporation (Griffith, Scott)
June 9, 2022 Filing 129 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO FRCP 7.1 by The Goodyear Tire & Rubber Co.. (McMeekin, John)
June 9, 2022 Filing 128 Defendant The Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company ANSWER to Complaint Plaintiffs, CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by The Goodyear Tire & Rubber Co..(McMeekin, John)
June 9, 2022 Filing 127 NOTICE of Appearance by John C McMeekin, II on behalf of The Goodyear Tire & Rubber Co. (McMeekin, John)
June 9, 2022 Filing 126 NOTICE of Appearance by Peter J Neeson on behalf of Honeywell International, Inc., Successor to Allied-Signal, Inc., Successor to Bendix Corporation (Neeson, Peter)
June 9, 2022 Filing 125 SPECIAL ADMISSIONS FORM APPROVED as to Jeffrey L. Pettit, Esq. Signed by Honorable Jennifer P. Wilson on 6/9/2022. (ve)
June 9, 2022 Filing 124 NOTICE of Appearance by Mark Douglas Eisler on behalf of Burham, LLC (Eisler, Mark)
June 9, 2022 DOCKET ANNOTATION: Doc. 114 - both attorney and sponsor verified in good condition. (gs)
June 8, 2022 Filing 123 MOTION for Joinder to Motions to Dismiss Counts IV and V of Plaintiffs' Complaint by CBS Corporation, A Delaware Corporation.(McShea, John)
June 8, 2022 Filing 122 MOTION for Joinder to Motions to Dismiss Counts IV and V of Plaintiffs' Complaint by General Electric Company.(McShea, John)
June 7, 2022 Filing 121 NOTICE of Appearance by Sarah Tankersley on behalf of American Premier Underwriters (Tankersley, Sarah)
June 7, 2022 Filing 120 Corporate Disclosure Statement by American Premier Underwriters identifying Corporate Parent American Financial Group, Inc. for American Premier Underwriters.. (Jones, Daniel)
June 7, 2022 Filing 119 First MOTION for Joinder in John Crane's and Flexible Technologies Motions to Dismiss Counts IV and V of Plaintiff's Complaint for Failure to State a Claim Upon Which Relief Can Be Granted by American Premier Underwriters.(Jones, Daniel)
June 7, 2022 Filing 118 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel L. Jones, Jr on behalf of American Premier Underwriters (Jones, Daniel)
June 7, 2022 Filing 117 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel L. Jones, Jr on behalf of American Premier Underwriters (Jones, Daniel)
June 7, 2022 Filing 116 NOTICE of Appearance by John Patrick McShea, III on behalf of General Electric Company (McShea, John)
June 7, 2022 Filing 115 NOTICE of Appearance by John Patrick McShea, III on behalf of CBS Corporation, A Delaware Corporation (McShea, John)
June 7, 2022 Filing 114 PETITION FOR SPECIAL ADMISSION (PRO HAC VICE) by Jeffrey Pettit on behalf of Marley-Wylain Company, LLC Attorney Jeffrey is seeking special admission. Filing fee $ 50, receipt number APAMDC-5966660.. (Pettit, Jeffrey)
June 7, 2022 Filing 113 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO FRCP 7.1 by CBS Corporation, A Delaware Corporation. (McShea, John)
June 7, 2022 Filing 112 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO FRCP 7.1 by General Electric Company. (McShea, John)
June 6, 2022 Filing 111 BRIEF IN OPPOSITION re #87 MOTION to Remand to State Court and memorandum in support thereof filed by Foster Wheeler LLC, Survivor to a merger with Foster Wheeler Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s), #2 Exhibit(s), #3 Exhibit(s), #4 Exhibit(s), #5 Exhibit(s), #6 Exhibit(s), #7 Exhibit(s), #8 Exhibit(s))(Valinis, Susan)
June 3, 2022 Filing 110 NOTICE of Appearance by Neal C. Glenn on behalf of Pfizer, Inc. (Glenn, Neal)
June 3, 2022 Filing 109 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO FRCP 7.1 by Pfizer, Inc.. (Hanna, Thomas)
June 3, 2022 Filing 108 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas P Hanna on behalf of Pfizer, Inc. (Hanna, Thomas)
June 2, 2022 Filing 107 DISCLOSURE REPORT. (Brumberg, John)
June 2, 2022 Filing 106 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO FRCP 7.1 by Goodrich Corporation identifying Corporate Parent Raytheon Technologies Corporation for Goodrich Corporation. (Brumberg, John)
June 2, 2022 Filing 105 NOTICE of Appearance by Mark R. Kehoe on behalf of Marley-Wylain Company, LLC (Kehoe, Mark)
June 2, 2022 Filing 104 SPECIAL ADMISSIONS FORM APPROVED as to Neal C. Glenn, Esq. Signed by Honorable Jennifer P. Wilson on 6/2/2022. (ve)
June 2, 2022 Filing 103 SPECIAL ADMISSIONS FORM APPROVED as to Thomas P. Hanna, Esq. Signed by Honorable Jennifer P. Wilson on 6/2/2022. (ve)
June 1, 2022 Filing 102 PETITION FOR SPECIAL ADMISSION (PRO HAC VICE) by Thomas P Hanna on behalf of Pfizer, Inc. Attorney Thomas P. Hanna is seeking special admission. Filing fee $ 50, receipt number APAMDC-5960387.. (Hanna, Thomas)
June 1, 2022 Filing 101 PETITION FOR SPECIAL ADMISSION (PRO HAC VICE) by Neal C. Glenn on behalf of Pfizer, Inc. Attorney Neal C. Glenn is seeking special admission. Filing fee $ 50, receipt number APAMDC-5960312.. (Glenn, Neal)
June 1, 2022 DOCKET ANNOTATION: Petitioning Counsel and Sponsors verified in Good Standing. (gs)
May 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 100 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE - IT IS ORDERED THAT Plaintiffs shall show cause why Defendants motions to dismiss, Docs. 6 & 8, should not be deemed unopposed for failure to file a response by June 14, 2022. Signed by Honorable Jennifer P. Wilson on 5/31/2022. (ve)
May 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 99 ORDER re #87 MOTION to Remand to State Court and memorandum in support thereof filed by Kathryn Heilner - IT IS ORDERED AS FOLLOWS:1) Defendant Foster Wheeler LLC, the party that removed this action to this court, shall file a responsive brief to Plaintiffs motion to remand to state court by June 6, 2022. 2) Any Defendants who wish to join Foster Wheeler LLCs brief or file their own responsive brief shall file an appropriate motion or brief within 7 days of Foster Wheeler LLCs brief. 3) Plaintiffs may file a reply to all briefs within 14 days of Defendants deadline to join Foster Wheeler LLCs brief or file their own briefs. Signed by Honorable Jennifer P. Wilson on 5/27/2022. (ve)
May 26, 2022 Filing 98 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO FRCP 7.1 by Cooper Industries, LLC. (Depfer, Joan)
May 26, 2022 Filing 97 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO FRCP 7.1 by Eaton Corporation, as Sussor-in-Interest to Cutler-Hammer, Inc.. (Depfer, Joan)
May 26, 2022 Filing 96 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO FRCP 7.1 by Kerite LLC. (Depfer, Joan)
May 26, 2022 Filing 95 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO FRCP 7.1 by RSCC Wire & Cable, LLC. (Depfer, Joan)
May 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 94 ORDER - IT IS ORDERED THAT the motions, Docs. 41, 42, & 43 are GRANTED. Signed by Honorable Jennifer P. Wilson on 5/26/2022 (ve)
May 25, 2022 Filing 93 Compudyne, LLC ANSWER to Complaint and Jury Demand; Affirmative Defenses; Cross-claims; and Answers to Cross-Claims, CROSSCLAIM against All Parties by Compudyne, LLC.(Bruch, G. Daniel)
May 25, 2022 Filing 92 NOTICE of Appearance by Gregory M. Stokes on behalf of Sid Harvey Industries, Inc. (Stokes, Gregory)
May 25, 2022 Filing 91 ANSWER to Complaint , CROSSCLAIM against A.O. Smith Corporation, Advanced Thermal Hydronics, LLC, Air & Liquid Systems Corporation, American Premier Underwriters, Aurora Pump Company, Automation Industries, Inc., Bayer Cropscience, Inc., Brand Insulations, Inc., Burham, LLC, CBS Corporation, A Delaware Corporation, Carrier Corporation, Cleaver Brooks, Inc., Columbus McKinnon Corporation, Compudyne, LLC, Cooper Industries, LLC, Corning Inc., on behalf of its former Corhart Refractories Business Division, Crane Company, DAP Products, Dyntherm Boiler Manufacturing, ECR International Inc., Individually and as Sessor-in-Interest to Utica Boilers, Easco Boiler Corp., Eaton Corporation, as Sussor-in-Interest to Cutler-Hammer, Inc., FMC Corporation, Individually and as successor in interest to Sterns Electric Corporation and Link-Belt Co./Construction Equipment Group, Flexible Technologies, Inc., Foseco, Inc., Foster Wheeler LLC, Survivor to a merger with Foster Wheeler Corp., GTE Operations Support, Inc., Successor in Interest to GTE Products of Connecticut Corporation, General Electric Company, Goodrich Corporation, Goulds Pumps, LLC, Greene, Tweed & Co, Inc., H.B. Fuller Company, H.B. Smith Company, Inc., a Division of Mestek, Inc., Hajoca Corp., Hobart Brothers Company, Honeywell International, Inc., Successor to Allied-Signal, Inc., Successor to Bendix Corporation, Honeywell, Inc., Industrical Holdings Corporation, J.H. France Refractories Company, John Crane, Inc., Keeler/Dorr-Oliver Boiler Company, Inc., Kerite LLC, Linde, LLC, Lockheed Martin Corporation, Marley-Wylain Company, LLC, Martin Marietta Materials, Inc., McCormick Asbestos Company, Mestek, Inc., Metropolitan Life Insurance Company, Inc., Mobil Corporation, Morgan Engineering, Pecora Corporation, Pfizer, Inc., Pollock Research & Design, Inc., RSCC Wire & Cable, LLC, Reed Finanncial Corp., Reunion Industries, Inc., Rockwell Automation, Inc., Schneider Electric USA, Inc., Sid Harvey Industries, Inc., Superior Boiler Works, Inc., Terex Corporation, The Goodyear Tire & Rubber Co., The John Wood Company, LLC, The Lincoln Electric Company, The Okonite Company, Union Carbide Corporation, Universal Refractories, a Division of Thiem Corporation, Viking Pump, Inc., Zurn Industries, LLC by IMO Industries, Inc., Individually and as Parent Company of and/or Successor to DeLaval Pump & Steam Turbine Co..(Fontak, Joseph)
May 24, 2022 Filing 90 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #87 MOTION to Remand to State Court and memorandum in support thereof filed by Kathryn Heilner.(Duncan, Jason)
May 24, 2022 Filing 89 SPECIAL ADMISSIONS FORM APPROVED as to Catherine N. Jasons. Signed by Honorable Jennifer P. Wilson on 5/24/22. (eo)
May 24, 2022 DOCKET ANNOTATION: Doc. 63 Petition for Special Admission - petitioning counsel and sponsor verified in good standing. (gs)
May 24, 2022 DOCKET ANNOTATION: Plaintiff's Counsel is directed to file the Brief in Support of Motion to Remand as a separate filing. (eo)
May 24, 2022 DOCKET ANNOTATION: Docs. 56 & 57 Petitions for Special Admission - both attorneys and sponsors verified in good standing. (gs)
May 24, 2022 DOCKET ANNOTATION: Doc. 22 - Petition for Special Admission on hold - counsel may seek general admission; asked that we keep Petition on the docket for now. (gs)
May 23, 2022 Filing 88 NOTICE of Appearance by G. Daniel Bruch on behalf of Compudyne, LLC (Bruch, G. Daniel)
May 23, 2022 Filing 87 MOTION to Remand to State Court and memorandum in support thereof by Kathryn Heilner. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Duncan, Jason)
May 23, 2022 Filing 86 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO FRCP 7.1 by Sid Harvey Industries, Inc.. (Bruch, G. Daniel)
May 23, 2022 Filing 85 Sid Harvey Industries, Inc. ANSWER to Complaint and Jury Demand; Affirmative Defenses; Cross-claims; and Answers to Cross-Claims, CROSSCLAIM against Sid Harvey Industries, Inc. by Sid Harvey Industries, Inc..(Bruch, G. Daniel)
May 23, 2022 Filing 84 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO FRCP 7.1 by Rockwell Automation, Inc.. (Bruch, G. Daniel)
May 23, 2022 Filing 83 NOTICE of Appearance by G. Daniel Bruch on behalf of Rockwell Automation, Inc. (Bruch, G. Daniel)
May 23, 2022 Filing 82 Rockwell Automation, Inc. as successor by merger to The Allen-Bradley Co. ANSWER to Complaint and Jury Demand; Affirmative Defenses; Cross-claims; and Answers to Cross-Claims, CROSSCLAIM against Rockwell Automation, Inc. by Rockwell Automation, Inc..(Bruch, G. Daniel)
May 23, 2022 Filing 81 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO FRCP 7.1 by The Okonite Company. (Bruch, G. Daniel)
May 23, 2022 Filing 80 NOTICE of Appearance by G. Daniel Bruch on behalf of The Okonite Company (Bruch, G. Daniel)
May 23, 2022 Filing 79 Okonite Company's ANSWER to Complaint and Jury Demand; Affirmative Defenses; Cross-claims; and Answers to Cross-Claims, CROSSCLAIM against All Parties by The Okonite Company.(Bruch, G. Daniel)
May 23, 2022 Filing 78 NOTICE of Appearance by G. Daniel Bruch on behalf of Crane Company (Bruch, G. Daniel)
May 23, 2022 Filing 77 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO FRCP 7.1 by Crane Company. (Bruch, G. Daniel)
May 23, 2022 Filing 76 Crane Co.'s ANSWER to Complaint and Jury Demand; Affirmative Defenses; Cross-claims; and Answers to Cross-Claims, CROSSCLAIM against All Parties by Crane Company.(Bruch, G. Daniel)
May 23, 2022 Filing 75 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO FRCP 7.1 by Compudyne, LLC. (Bruch, G. Daniel)
May 23, 2022 Filing 74 NOTICE of Appearance by G. Daniel Bruch on behalf of Compudyne, LLC (Bruch, G. Daniel)
May 23, 2022 Filing 73 ANSWER to Complaint , Affirmative Defenses, Cross-Claims, Answer to Cross-Claims and Jury Demand by Columbus McKinnon Corporation.(Desipio, Adam)
May 20, 2022 Filing 72 SPECIAL ADMISSIONS FORM APPROVED as to Gregory M. Stokes. Signed by Honorable Jennifer P. Wilson on 5/20/22. (eo)
May 20, 2022 Filing 71 SPECIAL ADMISSIONS FORM APPROVED as to Peter L. Lejeune. Signed by Honorable Jennifer P. Wilson on 5/20/22. (eo)
May 20, 2022 Filing 70 SPECIAL ADMISSIONS FORM APPROVED as to G. Daniel Bruch, Jr. Signed by Honorable Jennifer P. Wilson on 5/20/22. (eo)
May 19, 2022 Filing 69 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO FRCP 7.1 by Pollock Research & Design, Inc.. (Gries, Alan)
May 19, 2022 Filing 68 ANSWER to Complaint , Affirmative Defenses, CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by Pollock Research & Design, Inc..(Gries, Alan)
May 19, 2022 Filing 67 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO FRCP 7.1 by Union Carbide Corporation. (Jasons, Catherine)
May 19, 2022 Filing 66 NOTICE by Union Carbide Corporation NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (Jasons, Catherine)
May 19, 2022 Filing 65 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO FRCP 7.1 by Bayer Cropscience, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Bayer AG for Bayer Cropscience, Inc., Bayer Cropscience, Inc., Bayer Cropscience, Inc., Bayer Cropscience, Inc.. (Jasons, Catherine)
May 19, 2022 Filing 64 NOTICE by Bayer Cropscience, Inc. NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (Jasons, Catherine)
May 19, 2022 Filing 63 PETITION FOR SPECIAL ADMISSION (PRO HAC VICE) by Catherine N Jasons on behalf of Bayer Cropscience, Inc., Union Carbide Corporation Attorney Catherine N. Jasons is seeking special admission. Filing fee $ 50, receipt number APAMDC-5949830.. (Jasons, Catherine)
May 19, 2022 DOCKET ANNOTATION: Petitions for Special Admission (Docs. 35, 36, 37) attorneys and sponsors verified in good standing. (gs)
May 18, 2022 Filing 62 SPECIAL ADMISSIONS FORM APPROVED as to Lindsey Lunney. Signed by Honorable Jennifer P. Wilson on 5/18/22. (eo)
May 18, 2022 Filing 61 SPECIAL ADMISSIONS FORM APPROVED as to Susan M. Valinis. Signed by Honorable Jennifer P. Wilson on 5/18/22. (eo)
May 18, 2022 Filing 60 DISCLOSURE REPORT. (Leonard, Ryan)
May 18, 2022 Filing 59 ANSWER to Complaint by Reunion Industries, Inc..(Leonard, Ryan)
May 18, 2022 Filing 58 PETITION FOR SPECIAL ADMISSION (PRO HAC VICE) by G. Daniel Bruch on behalf of Sid Harvey Industries, Inc. Attorney Gregory Stokes is seeking special admission. Filing fee $ 50, receipt number APAMDC-5948353.. (Bruch, G. Daniel)
May 18, 2022 Filing 57 PETITION FOR SPECIAL ADMISSION (PRO HAC VICE) by G. Daniel Bruch on behalf of Compudyne, LLC, Crane Company, Rockwell Automation, Inc., The Okonite Company Attorney Peter Lejeune is seeking special admission. Filing fee $ 50, receipt number APAMDC-5948340.. (Bruch, G. Daniel)
May 18, 2022 Filing 56 PETITION FOR SPECIAL ADMISSION (PRO HAC VICE) by G. Daniel Bruch on behalf of Compudyne, LLC, Crane Company, Rockwell Automation, Inc., The Okonite Company Attorney G. Daniel Bruch is seeking special admission. Filing fee $ 50, receipt number APAMDC-5948319.. (Bruch, G. Daniel)
May 17, 2022 Filing 55 DISCLOSURE REPORT. (Fitzpatrick, John)
May 17, 2022 Filing 54 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO FRCP 7.1 by Viking Pump, Inc.. (Fitzpatrick, John)
May 17, 2022 Filing 53 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO FRCP 7.1 by Schneider Electric USA, Inc.. (Rideout, Christina)
May 17, 2022 Filing 52 NOTICE of Appearance by John A. Fitzpatrick on behalf of Viking Pump, Inc. (Fitzpatrick, John)
May 17, 2022 Filing 51 NOTICE of Appearance by Christina M. Rideout on behalf of Schneider Electric USA, Inc. (Rideout, Christina)
May 17, 2022 DOCKET ANNOTATION: Counsel is advised that the Petitions for Special Admission docketed at #35, 36 & 37 are to include the sponsor's information, including the Attorney ID, Address, phone number, etc. PLEASE DO NOT REDOCKET THE PETITIONS, ONLY DOCKET PAGE 3. (gs)
May 17, 2022 DOCKET ANNOTATION: Petitioning attorneys and sponsor verified to be in good standing for Docs. 44 & 45. (gs)
May 16, 2022 Filing 50 NOTICE of Appearance by John A. Fitzpatrick on behalf of Air & Liquid Systems Corporation (Fitzpatrick, John)
May 16, 2022 Filing 49 NOTICE of Appearance by Joan P. Depfer on behalf of Eaton Corporation, as Sussor-in-Interest to Cutler-Hammer, Inc. (Depfer, Joan)
May 16, 2022 Filing 48 NOTICE of Appearance by Joan P. Depfer on behalf of Cooper Industries, LLC (Depfer, Joan)
May 16, 2022 Filing 47 NOTICE of Appearance by Joan P. Depfer on behalf of RSCC Wire & Cable, LLC (Depfer, Joan)
May 16, 2022 Filing 46 NOTICE of Appearance by Joan P. Depfer on behalf of Kerite LLC (Depfer, Joan)
May 16, 2022 Filing 45 PETITION FOR SPECIAL ADMISSION (PRO HAC VICE) by Tracey McDevitt Hagan on behalf of Foster Wheeler LLC, Survivor to a merger with Foster Wheeler Corp. Attorney Lindsey Lunney is seeking special admission. Filing fee $ 50, receipt number APAMDC-5945535.. (Hagan, Tracey)
May 16, 2022 Filing 44 PETITION FOR SPECIAL ADMISSION (PRO HAC VICE) by Tracey McDevitt Hagan on behalf of Foster Wheeler LLC, Survivor to a merger with Foster Wheeler Corp. Attorney Susan Valinis is seeking special admission. Filing fee $ 50, receipt number BPAMDC-5945507.. (Hagan, Tracey)
May 13, 2022 Filing 43 MOTION for Joinder in Motion to Dismiss Counts IV & V of Plaintiff's Complaint by Superior Boiler Works, Inc..(Hagan, Tracey)
May 13, 2022 Filing 42 MOTION for Joinder in Motion to Dismiss Counts IV & V of Plaintiff's Complaint by Foster Wheeler LLC, Survivor to a merger with Foster Wheeler Corp..(Hagan, Tracey)
May 13, 2022 Filing 41 MOTION for Joinder in Motion to Dismiss Counts IV & V of Plaintiff's Complaint by Cleaver Brooks, Inc..(Hagan, Tracey)
May 13, 2022 Filing 40 NOTICE of Appearance by Tracey McDevitt Hagan on behalf of Superior Boiler Works, Inc. (Hagan, Tracey)
May 13, 2022 Filing 39 NOTICE of Appearance by Tracey McDevitt Hagan on behalf of J.H. France Refractories Company (Hagan, Tracey)
May 13, 2022 Filing 38 NOTICE of Appearance by Tracey McDevitt Hagan on behalf of Cleaver Brooks, Inc. (Hagan, Tracey)
May 13, 2022 Filing 37 PETITION FOR SPECIAL ADMISSION (PRO HAC VICE) by G. Daniel Bruch on behalf of Sid Harvey Industries, Inc. Attorney Gregory Stokes is seeking special admission. Filing fee $ 50, receipt number APAMDC-5945039.. (Bruch, G. Daniel)
May 13, 2022 Filing 36 PETITION FOR SPECIAL ADMISSION (PRO HAC VICE) by G. Daniel Bruch on behalf of Compudyne, LLC, Crane Company, Rockwell Automation, Inc., The Okonite Company Attorney Peter Lejeune is seeking special admission. Filing fee $ 50, receipt number APAMDC-5945027.. (Bruch, G. Daniel)
May 13, 2022 Filing 35 PETITION FOR SPECIAL ADMISSION (PRO HAC VICE) by G. Daniel Bruch on behalf of Compudyne, LLC, Crane Company, Rockwell Automation, Inc., The Okonite Company Attorney G. Daniel Bruch is seeking special admission. Filing fee $ 50, receipt number APAMDC-5945002.. (Bruch, G. Daniel)
May 12, 2022 Filing 34 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO FRCP 7.1 by Columbus McKinnon Corporation. (Sidelsky, Cory)
May 12, 2022 Filing 33 NOTICE of Appearance by Cory C. Sidelsky on behalf of Columbus McKinnon Corporation (Sidelsky, Cory)
May 12, 2022 Filing 32 NOTICE of Appearance by Adam A. Desipio on behalf of Columbus McKinnon Corporation (Desipio, Adam)
May 11, 2022 Filing 31 NOTICE of Appearance by John R Brumberg on behalf of Goodrich Corporation (Brumberg, John)
May 10, 2022 Filing 30 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO FRCP 7.1 by Reunion Industries, Inc.. (Leonard, Ryan)
May 10, 2022 Filing 29 NOTICE of Appearance by Ryan L. Leonard on behalf of Reunion Industries, Inc.. (Leonard, Ryan)
May 10, 2022 Filing 28 ANSWER to Complaint , CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by Universal Refractories, a Division of Thiem Corporation.(Dugan, John)
May 10, 2022 Filing 27 COUNTY COURT RECORD from Dauphin. (gs)
May 10, 2022 Filing 26 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO FRCP 7.1 by Universal Refractories, a Division of Thiem Corporation. (Dugan, John)
May 10, 2022 Filing 25 NOTICE of Appearance by John J. Dugan on behalf of Universal Refractories, a Division of Thiem Corporation (Dugan, John)
May 9, 2022 DOCKET ANNOTATION: Counsel is advised that page 3 of the Petition for Special Admission must contain the name, address and PA ID number for sponsoring counsel in Section 2. PLEASE DO NOT REFILE THE PETITION; DOCKET PAGE 3 AS A SUPPLEMENT TO THE PETITION. (gs)
May 6, 2022 Filing 24 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #6 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by John Crane, Inc..(Turner, Tiffany)
May 6, 2022 Filing 23 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #8 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Flexible Technologies, Inc..(Turner, Tiffany)
May 6, 2022 Filing 22 PETITION FOR SPECIAL ADMISSION (PRO HAC VICE) by Theresa M Mullaney on behalf of ECR International Inc., Individually and as Sessor-in-Interest to Utica Boilers Attorney Theresa Mullaney is seeking special admission. Filing fee $ 50, receipt number APAMDC-5937832.. (Mullaney, Theresa)
May 5, 2022 Filing 21 Certification of Non-Concurrence to Motion to Dismiss, filed by John Crane, Inc..(Turner, Tiffany)
May 5, 2022 Filing 20 Certification of Non-Concurrence to Motion to Dismiss, filed by Flexible Technologies, Inc..(Turner, Tiffany)
May 5, 2022 Filing 19 Corporate Disclosure Statement by IMO Industries, Inc., Individually and as Parent Company of and/or Successor to DeLaval Pump & Steam Turbine Co. identifying Corporate Parent ESAB Corporation for IMO Industries, Inc., Individually and as Parent Company of and/or Successor to DeLaval Pump & Steam Turbine Co... (Fontak, Joseph)
May 5, 2022 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph I. Fontak on behalf of IMO Industries, Inc., Individually and as Parent Company of and/or Successor to DeLaval Pump & Steam Turbine Co. (Fontak, Joseph)
May 5, 2022 Filing 17 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO FRCP 7.1 by Flexible Technologies, Inc. identifying Other Affiliate Smiths Group plc. for Flexible Technologies, Inc.. (Turner, Tiffany)
May 5, 2022 Filing 16 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO FRCP 7.1 by Martin Marietta Materials, Inc.. (Turner, Tiffany)
May 5, 2022 Filing 15 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO FRCP 7.1 by Lockheed Martin Corporation. (Turner, Tiffany)
May 5, 2022 Filing 14 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO FRCP 7.1 by ECR International Inc., Individually and as Sessor-in-Interest to Utica Boilers. (Mullaney, Theresa)
May 5, 2022 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Theresa M Mullaney on behalf of ECR International Inc., Individually and as Sessor-in-Interest to Utica Boilers (Mullaney, Theresa)
May 5, 2022 Filing 12 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO FRCP 7.1 by FMC Corporation, Individually and as successor in interest to Sterns Electric Corporation and Link-Belt Co./Construction Equipment Group. (Rideout, Christina)
May 5, 2022 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Christina M. Rideout on behalf of FMC Corporation, Individually and as successor in interest to Sterns Electric Corporation and Link-Belt Co./Construction Equipment Group (Rideout, Christina)
May 5, 2022 DOCKET ANNOTATION: Counsel to file a certificate of concurrence/nonconcurrence and docket the brief separately from the MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by John Crane, Inc (doc 6). (eo)
May 5, 2022 DOCKET ANNOTATION: Counsel to file a certificate of concurrence/nonconcurrence and docket the brief separately from the MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Flexible Technologies, Inc (doc 8). (eo)
May 4, 2022 Filing 10 ANSWER to Complaint , CROSSCLAIM against A.O. Smith Corporation, Advanced Thermal Hydronics, LLC, Air & Liquid Systems Corporation, American Premier Underwriters, Aurora Pump Company, Automation Industries, Inc., Bayer Cropscience, Inc., Brand Insulations, Inc., Burham, LLC, CBS Corporation, A Delaware Corporation, Carrier Corporation, Cleaver Brooks, Inc., Columbus McKinnon Corporation, Compudyne, LLC, Cooper Industries, LLC, Corning Inc., on behalf of its former Corhart Refractories Business Division, Crane Company, DAP Products, Dyntherm Boiler Manufacturing, ECR International Inc., Individually and as Sessor-in-Interest to Utica Boilers, Earl K. Heilner, Jr., Hobart Brothers Company, Honeywell International, Inc., Successor to Allied-Signal, Inc., Successor to Bendix Corporation, Honeywell, Inc., IMO Industries, Inc., Individually and as Parent Company of and/or Successor to DeLaval Pump & Steam Turbine Co., Easco Boiler Corp., Eaton Corporation, as Sussor-in-Interest to Cutler-Hammer, Inc., FMC Corporation, Individually and as successor in interest to Sterns Electric Corporation and Link-Belt Co./Construction Equipment Group, Flexible Technologies, Inc., Foseco, Inc., Foster Wheeler LLC, Survivor to a merger with Foster Wheeler Corp., GTE Operations Support, Inc., Successor in Interest to GTE Products of Connecticut Corporation, General Electric Company, Goodrich Corporation, Goulds Pumps, LLC, Greene, Tweed & Co, Inc., H.B. Fuller Company, H.B. Smith Company, Inc., a Division of Mestek, Inc., Hajoca Corp., Kathryn Heilner, Industrical Holdings Corporation, J.H. France Refractories Company, John Crane, Inc., Keeler/Dorr-Oliver Boiler Company, Inc., Kerite LLC, Linde, LLC, Marley-Wylain Company, LLC, McCormick Asbestos Company, Mestek, Inc., Metropolitan Life Insurance Company, Inc., Mobil Corporation, Morgan Engineering, Pecora Corporation, Pfizer, Inc., Poillock Research & Design, Inc., RSCC Wire & Cable, LLC, Reed Finanncial Corp., Reunion Industries, Inc., Rockwell Automation, Inc., Schneider Electric USA, Inc., Sid Harvey Industries, Inc., Superior Boiler Works, Inc., Terex Corporation, The Goodyear Tire & Rubber Co., The John Wood Company, LLC, The Lincoln Electric Company, The Okonite Company, Union Carbide Corporation, Universal Refractories, a Division of Thiem Corporation, Viking Pump, Inc., Warren Pumps, LLC, Zurn Industries, LLC by Martin Marietta Materials, Inc..(Turner, Tiffany)
May 4, 2022 Filing 9 ANSWER to Complaint , CROSSCLAIM against A.O. Smith Corporation, Advanced Thermal Hydronics, LLC, Air & Liquid Systems Corporation, American Premier Underwriters, Aurora Pump Company, Automation Industries, Inc., Bayer Cropscience, Inc., Brand Insulations, Inc., Burham, LLC, CBS Corporation, A Delaware Corporation, Carrier Corporation, Cleaver Brooks, Inc., Columbus McKinnon Corporation, Compudyne, LLC, Cooper Industries, LLC, Corning Inc., on behalf of its former Corhart Refractories Business Division, Crane Company, DAP Products, Dyntherm Boiler Manufacturing, ECR International Inc., Individually and as Sessor-in-Interest to Utica Boilers, Easco Boiler Corp., Eaton Corporation, as Sussor-in-Interest to Cutler-Hammer, Inc., FMC Corporation, Individually and as successor in interest to Sterns Electric Corporation and Link-Belt Co./Construction Equipment Group, Flexible Technologies, Inc., Foseco, Inc., Foster Wheeler LLC, Survivor to a merger with Foster Wheeler Corp., GTE Operations Support, Inc., Successor in Interest to GTE Products of Connecticut Corporation, General Electric Company, Goodrich Corporation, Goulds Pumps, LLC, Greene, Tweed & Co, Inc., H.B. Fuller Company, H.B. Smith Company, Inc., a Division of Mestek, Inc., Hajoca Corp., Kathryn Heilner, Earl K. Heilner, Jr., Hobart Brothers Company, Honeywell International, Inc., Successor to Allied-Signal, Inc., Successor to Bendix Corporation, Honeywell, Inc., IMO Industries, Inc., Individually and as Parent Company of and/or Successor to DeLaval Pump & Steam Turbine Co., Industrical Holdings Corporation, J.H. France Refractories Company, John Crane, Inc., Keeler/Dorr-Oliver Boiler Company, Inc., Kerite LLC, Linde, LLC, Marley-Wylain Company, LLC, McCormick Asbestos Company, Mestek, Inc., Metropolitan Life Insurance Company, Inc., Mobil Corporation, Morgan Engineering, Pecora Corporation, Pfizer, Inc., Poillock Research & Design, Inc., RSCC Wire & Cable, LLC, Reed Finanncial Corp., Reunion Industries, Inc., Rockwell Automation, Inc., Schneider Electric USA, Inc., Sid Harvey Industries, Inc., Superior Boiler Works, Inc., Terex Corporation, The Goodyear Tire & Rubber Co., The John Wood Company, LLC, The Lincoln Electric Company, The Okonite Company, Union Carbide Corporation, Universal Refractories, a Division of Thiem Corporation, Viking Pump, Inc., Warren Pumps, LLC, Zurn Industries, LLC by Lockheed Martin Corporation.(Turner, Tiffany)
May 4, 2022 Filing 8 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Flexible Technologies, Inc..(Turner, Tiffany)
May 4, 2022 Filing 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO FRCP 7.1 by John Crane, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Smiths Group plc. for John Crane, Inc.. (Turner, Tiffany)
May 4, 2022 Filing 6 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by John Crane, Inc..(Turner, Tiffany)
May 3, 2022 Filing 5 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO FRCP 7.1 by A.O. Smith Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Kadish, Eric)
May 3, 2022 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Eric J Kadish on behalf of A.O. Smith Corporation (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Kadish, Eric)
May 2, 2022 Filing 3 Letter to Counsel re: Case Assignment Procedures. Signed by Honorable Jennifer P. Wilson (eo)
April 28, 2022 Filing 2 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO FRCP 7.1 by Foster Wheeler LLC, Survivor to a merger with Foster Wheeler Corp. identifying Corporate Parent John Wood Group plc (Scotland).(gs)
April 28, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Foster Wheeler LLC ( Filing fee $ 402 ), filed by Foster Wheeler LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B)(gs)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Heilner, Jr. et al v. Advanced Thermal Hydronics, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: Advanced Thermal Hydronics, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: Burham, LLC
Represented By: Mark Douglas Eisler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: Industrical Holdings Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: McCormick Asbestos Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: Marley-Wylain Company, LLC
Represented By: Jeffrey Pettit
Represented By: Mark R. Kehoe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: A.O. Smith Corporation
Represented By: Eric J Kadish
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: Brand Insulations, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: Cleaver Brooks, Inc.
Represented By: Tracey McDevitt Hagan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: Columbus McKinnon Corporation
Represented By: Adam A. Desipio
Represented By: Cory C. Sidelsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: Compudyne, LLC
Represented By: G. Daniel Bruch
Represented By: Peter L. Lejeune
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: Cooper Industries, LLC
Represented By: Joan P. Depfer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: Corning Inc., on behalf of its former Corhart Refractories Business Division
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: Crane Company
Represented By: G. Daniel Bruch
Represented By: Peter L. Lejeune
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: DAP Products
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: Eaton Corporation, as Sussor-in-Interest to Cutler-Hammer, Inc.
Represented By: Joan P. Depfer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: FMC Corporation, Individually and as successor in interest to Sterns Electric Corporation and Link-Belt Co./Construction Equipment Group
Represented By: Christina M. Rideout
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: Foseco, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: Pollock Research & Deisgn, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bayer Cropscience, Inc.
Represented By: Catherine N Jasons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CBS Corporation, A Delaware Corporation
Represented By: John Patrick McShea, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dyntherm Boiler Manufacturing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Easco Boiler Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Flexible Technologies, Inc.
Represented By: Tiffany F Turner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Goodrich Corporation
Represented By: John R Brumberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Goulds Pumps, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Crane, Inc.
Represented By: Tiffany F Turner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Linde, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lockheed Martin Corporation
Represented By: Tiffany F Turner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Morgan Engineering
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Reunion Industries, Inc.
Represented By: Ryan L. Leonard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Schneider Electric USA, Inc.
Represented By: Christina M. Rideout
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Reed Financial Inc., Individually and as Successor to The Hydrotherm Corporation, Cogency Global, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Premier Underwriters
Represented By: Daniel L. Jones, Jr.
Represented By: Sarah Tankersley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Air & Liquid Systems Corporation
Represented By: John A. Fitzpatrick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aurora Pump Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Automation Industries, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amchem Products, Inc.
Represented By: Catherine N Jasons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Burnham Corp.
Represented By: Mark Douglas Eisler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carrier Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CBS Corporation, a Pennsylvania Corporation
Represented By: John Patrick McShea, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Westinghouse Electric Corp.
Represented By: John Patrick McShea, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bethlehem Dynatherm
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal Boilers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Automation Industries, Individually and as Successor to Hydrotherm, Inc.
Represented By: Tiffany F Turner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Foster Wheeler LLC, Survivor to a merger with Foster Wheeler Corp.
Represented By: Tracey McDevitt Hagan
Represented By: Lindsey Lunney
Represented By: Susan M Valinis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Electric Company
Represented By: John Patrick McShea, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The B.F. Goodrich Co.
Represented By: John R Brumberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Goodyear Tire & Rubber Co.
Represented By: John C McMeekin, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Goulds Pumps Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Greene, Tweed & Co, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GTE Operations Support, Inc., Successor in Interest to GTE Products of Connecticut Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hajoca Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: H.B. Fuller Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: H.B. Smith Company, Inc., a Division of Mestek, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hobart Brothers Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Honeywell, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Honeywell International, Inc., Successor to Allied-Signal, Inc., Successor to Bendix Corporation
Represented By: Peter J Neeson
Represented By: Scott F. Griffith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: IMO Industries, Inc., Individually and as Parent Company of and/or Successor to DeLaval Pump & Steam Turbine Co.
Represented By: Joseph I. Fontak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carborundum Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J.H. France Refractories Company
Represented By: Tracey McDevitt Hagan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crane Packing Co.
Represented By: Tiffany F Turner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The John Wood Company, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Keeler/Dorr-Oliver Boiler Company, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kerite LLC
Represented By: Joan P. Depfer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Lincoln Electric Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The BCC Group, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Martin Marietta Corporation
Represented By: Tiffany F Turner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Martin Marietta Materials, Inc.
Represented By: Tiffany F Turner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MCIC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mestek, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Metropolitan Life Insurance Company, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mobil Corporation
Represented By: David J. Singley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Morgan Crane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Okonite Company
Represented By: G. Daniel Bruch
Represented By: Peter L. Lejeune
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pecora Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pfizer, Inc.
Represented By: Neal C. Glenn
Represented By: Thomas P Hanna
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Poillock Research & Design, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Reed Finanncial Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alliance Machines
Represented By: Ryan L. Leonard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rockwell Automation, Inc.
Represented By: G. Daniel Bruch
Represented By: Peter L. Lejeune
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RSCC Wire & Cable, LLC
Represented By: Joan P. Depfer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Square D Company
Represented By: Christina M. Rideout
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sid Harvey Industries, Inc.
Represented By: Gregory M. Stokes
Represented By: G. Daniel Bruch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Superior Boiler Works, Inc.
Represented By: Tracey McDevitt Hagan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Terex Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Union Carbide Corporation
Represented By: Catherine N Jasons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Universal Refractories, a Division of Thiem Corporation
Represented By: John J. Dugan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ECR International Inc., Individually and as Sessor-in-Interest to Utica Boilers
Represented By: Theresa M Mullaney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Viking Pump, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warren Pumps, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Weil-McLain
Represented By: Jeffrey Pettit
Represented By: Mark R. Kehoe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zurn Industries, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pollock Research & Design, Inc.
Represented By: Alan R. Gries
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Earl K. Heilner, Jr.
Represented By: Jason B. Duncan
Represented By: Lauren S Linsenbach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kathryn Heilner
Represented By: Jason B. Duncan
Represented By: Lauren S Linsenbach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?