Swenson et al v. Vedder et al
Plaintiff: Kenneth Swenson, I, Cindy Card and Ladonna Card
Defendant: Judge Clyde Vedder, Erik D. Spurlin, Julie Stoil Fernandez, Raymond Card, Kermit Card, Brandy G. Hoke and Finkel & Fernandez, LLP
Case Number: 1:2022cv00635
Filed: April 30, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Susan E Schwab
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 14, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 14, 2022 Filing 22 CONSENT FORM SENT (For Direct Assignment Cases to Magistrate Judges) to Cindy Card, Kermit Card, Ladonna Card, Raymond Card, Julie Stoil Fernandez, Finkel & Fernandez, LLP, Erik D. Spurlin, Kenneth Swenson, I, Clyde Vedder YOU MUST SAVE THIS FORM TO YOUR DESKTOP. THEN OPEN THE SAVED FORM AND COMPLETE THE REQUIRED SECTIONS. DO NOT FILE THIS FORM IN THE CLERKS OFFICE. THE COMPLETED FORM MUST BE E-MAILED TO consents@pamd.uscourts.gov OR IF YOU DO NOT HAVE AN E-MAIL ACCOUNT YOU MAY MAIL THE FORM TO Clerks Administrative Assistant, Clerks Office, P.O. Box 1148, Scranton, PA 18501-1148. Consent Form due by 7/14/2022 (ki)
June 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 20 SCHEDULING ORDER Setting Telephone Status Conference for 6/14/2022 @ 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Susan E. Schwab; Counsel for deft Vedder to initiate the call to Chambers; Pro se plaintiffs Swenson, C. Card & L. Card to provide cnsl for deft Vedder with telephone numbers where they may be reached forthwith. (See order for complete details.) Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan E. Schwab on 6/8/22. (ki)
June 7, 2022 Filing 19 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #13 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Erik D. Spurlin.(Spurlin, Erik)
June 7, 2022 Filing 18 BRIEF IN OPPOSITION to re #12 MOTION to Dismiss Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Defendant Judge Clyde Vedders Motion to Dismiss filed by Kenneth Swenson, I.(Swenson, Kenneth) Modified on 6/14/2022 (ki).
June 7, 2022 Filing 17 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #12 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Clyde Vedder.(Liebenguth, Caroline)
June 7, 2022 Filing 16 BRIEF IN OPPOSITION to #13 MOTION to Dismiss Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Erik Spurlin Motion to Dismiss filed by Kenneth Swenson, I.(Swenson, Kenneth) Modified on 6/14/2022 (ki).
June 7, 2022 Filing 15 BRIEF IN OPPOSITION to #11 MOTION to Dismiss Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Defendant Kermit Card, Raymond Card, Julie Stoil Fernandezs (Defendants) Motion to Dismiss filed by Kenneth Swenson, I.(Swenson, Kenneth) Modified on 6/14/2022 (ki).
June 6, 2022 Filing 14 BRIEF IN SUPPORT of Defendants Julie Stoil Fernandez, Finkel & Fernandez, LLP, Raymond Card and Kermit Card re #11 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Kermit Card, Raymond Card, Julie Stoil Fernandez, Finkel & Fernandez, LLP.(Simpson, Kathryn)
May 24, 2022 Filing 13 MOTION to Dismiss by Erik D. Spurlin. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Spurlin, Erik)
May 24, 2022 Filing 12 MOTION to Dismiss by Clyde Vedder. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Liebenguth, Caroline)
May 23, 2022 Filing 11 MOTION to Dismiss by Kermit Card, Raymond Card, Julie Stoil Fernandez.(Simpson, Kathryn)
May 14, 2022 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Kenneth Swenson, I RE: Kermit Card (Swenson, Kenneth)
May 14, 2022 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Kenneth Swenson, I RE: Raymond Card (Swenson, Kenneth)
May 10, 2022 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Kenneth Swenson, I RE: Brandy Hoke (Swenson, Kenneth)
May 10, 2022 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Kenneth Swenson, I Clyde Vedder (Swenson, Kenneth)
May 10, 2022 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Kenneth Swenson, I RE: Erik Spurlin (Swenson, Kenneth)
May 10, 2022 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Kenneth Swenson, I RE: Julie Fernandez (Swenson, Kenneth)
May 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER directing pltfs to, w/in 90 days of the date they filed the complaint, serve the summons & the complaint on the defts in acc w/ FRCP 4, or obtain waiver of service from defts; pltfs shall file returns of service w/in 90 days of the date they filed the complaint. (See order for complete details.) Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan E. Schwab on 5/2/22. (ki)
May 2, 2022 Filing 3 MOTION for Declaratory Judgment and Preliminary Injunction and Temporary Restraining Order filed by Kenneth Swenson.(aaa)
May 2, 2022 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to All Defendants and provided TO ATTORNEY ELECTRONICALLY VIA ECF for service on Defendant(s)in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS RECEIVING THE SUMMONS ELECTRONICALLY: You must print the summons and the attachment when you receive it in your e-mail and serve the complaint on all defendants in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure). (Attachments: #1 Summons Packet) (aaa)
April 30, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $402, Receipt Number APAMDC-5931545), filed by Kenneth Swenson. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(aaa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Swenson et al v. Vedder et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenneth Swenson, I
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cindy Card
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ladonna Card
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Judge Clyde Vedder
Represented By: Caroline Liebenguth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Erik D. Spurlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Julie Stoil Fernandez
Represented By: Kathryn L Simpson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Raymond Card
Represented By: Kathryn L Simpson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kermit Card
Represented By: Kathryn L Simpson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brandy G. Hoke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Finkel & Fernandez, LLP
Represented By: Kathryn L Simpson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?